EP0803123 - REMOVABLE ELECTRONIC SUBASSEMBLY WITH A COMPRESSIBLE SHOCK ABSORBING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2000 [2000/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGARAJAN, Subrahmanyan 13 Pioneer Lane Auburn, MA 01501 / US | [1997/44] | Representative(s) | de Pena, Alain, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | de Pena, Alain, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 95942068.8 | 05.12.1995 | [1997/44] | WO1995EP04773 | Priority number, date | US19940361410 | 22.12.1994 Original published format: US 361410 | [1997/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9619806 | Date: | 27.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0803123 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0803123 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G11B25/04, H05K5/02 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
G11B33/124 (EP,US);
G06F3/06 (KR);
G11B25/043 (EP,US);
G11B33/08 (EP,US);
H05K5/0269 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [1997/44] | Title | German: | ABNEHMBARE ELEKTRONISCHE BAUGRUPPE MIT KOMPRIMIERBARER STOSSDÄMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1997/44] | English: | REMOVABLE ELECTRONIC SUBASSEMBLY WITH A COMPRESSIBLE SHOCK ABSORBING DEVICE | [1997/44] | French: | SOUS-ENSEMBLE ELECTRONIQUE AMOVIBLE A DISPOSITIF AMORTISSEUR COMPRESSIBLE | [1997/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 26.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9411873 (MAXTOR CORP [US]) [X] 1-16 * page 9, line 2 - line 10; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0610025 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,9,10 * column 3, line 35 - line 45 *; | [PA] - NASS R, "PLUG INTO PCMCIA FOR PORTABLE MASS STORAGE", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, (19950109), vol. 43, no. 1, page 79/80, 82, 86/87, XP000494943 [PA] 1,9,16 * the whole document * |