EP0805775 - ACTUATING MEANS FOR A LIFT DOOR CATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALIMAK AB Box 306 14 S-931 03 Skelleftea / SE | [1997/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNDH, Thomas Skramträskvägen 37 S-931 43 Skelleftea / SE | [1997/46] | Representative(s) | Rosenquist, Per Olof, et al Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | Rosenquist, Per Olof, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 95942344.3 | 19.12.1995 | [1997/46] | WO1995SE01544 | Priority number, date | SE19940004546 | 28.12.1994 Original published format: SE 9404546 | [1997/46] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9620126 | Date: | 04.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0805775 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0805775 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B66B13/16 | [1997/46] | CPC: |
B66B13/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1997/46] | Title | German: | BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE AUFZUGSTÜRVERRIEGELUNG | [1997/46] | English: | ACTUATING MEANS FOR A LIFT DOOR CATCH | [1997/46] | French: | MECANISME DE MANOEUVRE DU VERROU D'UNE PORTE D'ASCENSEUR | [1997/46] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.1995 | Translation filed | 17.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 17.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/46] | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 18.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26] | Request for further processing for: | 27.12.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 27.12.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3659677 ; | [Y]US1188752 ; | [A]US3721319 ; | [A]US1352304 |