EP0800439 - CHECKING DEVICE FOR A MICROFINISHING MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2001 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARPOSS SOCIETA' PER AZIONI Via Saliceto 13 40010 Bentivoglio BO / IT | [1997/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALCHIERI, Giordano Via W. Goethe, 7 I-40128 Bologna / IT | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Tamburini, Lucio c/o Marposs S.p.A. Via Saliceto 13 40010 Bentivoglio / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Tamburini, Lucio c/o Marposs S.p.A. Via Saliceto 13 40010 Bentivoglio / IT | ||
Former [2000/03] | Tamburini, Lucio, et al c/o Marposs S.p.A. Via Saliceto 13 40010 Bentivoglio / IT | ||
Former [1997/42] | Miniucchi, Silvio c/o Marposs S.p.A. Via Saliceto 13 40010 Bentivoglio (Bologna) / IT | Application number, filing date | 95942674.3 | 15.12.1995 | [1997/42] | WO1995EP04971 | Priority number, date | IT1994BO00578 | 27.12.1994 Original published format: IT BO940578 | [1997/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9620068 | Date: | 04.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0800439 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0800439 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B24B49/04, B24B5/42, B24B21/00 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
B24B21/004 (EP,US);
B24B49/045 (EP,US);
B24B5/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/42] | Title | German: | KONTROLLVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE FEINSTBEARBEITUNGSMASCHINE | [1997/42] | English: | CHECKING DEVICE FOR A MICROFINISHING MACHINE TOOL | [1997/42] | French: | APPAREIL DE CONTROLE D'UNE MACHINE-OUTIL DE SUPERFINITION | [1997/42] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 12.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 16.08.2000 | LI | 16.08.2000 | [2002/02] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0382336 (IND METAL PROD CORP [US]) [A] 1,9* figures 1-6 *; | [A]US5311704 (BARTON II KENNETH A [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 63; figure 3 *; | [PA]WO9529791 (IND METAL PROD CORP [US]) [PA] 1,9 * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 12; figure 14 * |