EP0800366 - AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING A FRONT URINE-COLLECTING PART AND A REAR FAECES-COLLECTING PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
ES
FR
IT
NL
SE
SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [1999/17] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states Mölnlycke AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUIDOTTI, Ted Annaholmsgatan 10 S-412 67 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
GUSTAFSSON, Anders Kofferdalsvägen 5181 S-427 35 Billdal / SE | 03 /
WIDLUND, Urban Päronvägen 5 S-435 43 Mölnlycke / SE | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Hyltner, Jan-Olof, et al Albihns.Zacco Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Hyltner, Jan-Olof, et al Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/06] | Hyltner, Jan-Olof, et al Albihns Stockholm AB, P.O.Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1999/06] | Hyltner, Jan-Olof, et al AB Dahls Patentbyra, Box 606 182 16 Danderyd / SE | ||
Former [1997/42] | Hyltner, Jan-Olof, et al Noréns Patentbyra AB, Box 10198 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 95942812.9 | 15.12.1995 | [1997/42] | WO1995SE01520 | Priority number, date | SE19940004567 | 30.12.1994 Original published format: SE 9404567 | [1997/42] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9620666 | Date: | 11.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0800366 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0800366 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0800366 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
A61F13/495 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, SE [1999/17] |
Former [1997/42] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL MIT EINEM VORDERBEHÄLTER FÜR URIN UND EINEM HINTERBEHÄLTER FÜR FÄKALIEN | [1997/42] | English: | AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING A FRONT URINE-COLLECTING PART AND A REAR FAECES-COLLECTING PART | [1997/42] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT DOTE D'UNE PARTIE AVANT RECUEILLANT L'URINE ET D'UNE PARTIE ARRIERE RECUEILLANT LES FECES | [1997/42] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.1997 | Translation filed | 23.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 12.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.07.2000
18.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Hirsch, Uwe T. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.07.2000
18.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2000/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.07.2000
The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH 65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | 31.08.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.12.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.11.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.12.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.12.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.12.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 10.06.2002 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 31.12.2000 | [2009/30] | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9414395 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]EP0355740 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) | Examination | ES2022026 |