EP0799106 - FRONT-LOADING ROTARY RING CUTTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GLEASON WORKS 1000 University Avenue Rochester New York 14692 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states THE GLEASON WORKS 1000 University Avenue Rochester New York 14692 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALL, Robert, J. Trevean, Eddystone Close, Heybrook Bay Plymouth, Devon PL1 1AA / GB | 02 /
LAKEY, Martin, John 34 Sherril Close, Staddiscombe Plymouth, Devon PL1 1AA / GB | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 95942833.5 | 08.11.1995 | [1997/41] | WO1995US13192 | Priority number, date | US19940362696 | 22.12.1994 Original published format: US 362696 | [1997/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9619310 | Date: | 27.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0799106 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0799106 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B23F23/12, B23F21/02, B23F21/22, B23C5/26 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
B23F23/1206 (EP,US);
B23F21/226 (EP,US);
B23F23/1212 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1705 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1946 (EP,US);
Y10T409/30952 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2002/06] |
Former [1997/41] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE | Title | German: | ROTIERENDES RINGFÖRMIGES SCHMEIDEWERKZEUG MIT FRONTLADUNG | [1997/41] | English: | FRONT-LOADING ROTARY RING CUTTER | [1997/41] | French: | FRAISE A BAGUE ROTATIVE A CHARGEMENT FRONTAL | [1997/41] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US4061076 (ROBERTSON DONALD A) [X] 25,26 * column 1, line 52 - line 60 * * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 18 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 12 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,23 [Y] 1,5,6,11; | [DYA]US5137402 (BALL ROBERT J [GB], et al) [DY] 1,5,6,11 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 2 * * column 8, line 26 - line 28 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 23; | [XA]GB2028200 (KENNAMETAL INC) [X] 25,26 * page 1, line 13 - line 19 * * page 1, line 44 - line 50 * * page 1, line 113 - page 2, line 5 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 23; | [A]US3136217 (SWANSON FRED R, et al) [A] 7,8 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 9 * * column 2, line 28 - line 31 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3674280 (PEDERSEN HARRY) [A] 23 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 14 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4799337 (KOTTHAUS ERICH [CH]) [A] 23 * column 9, line 56 - line 58 * * figure 2 *; | [A]JPS6471620 ; | [A]US3357307 (PICANOL JOSE [BE]); | [A]JPH0587209 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890623), vol. 13, no. 274, Database accession no. (M - 841), & JP01071620 A 19890316 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 23 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930806), vol. 017, no. 423, Database accession no. (M - 1458), & JP05087209 A 19930406 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) |