EP0813415 - THIONOPHOSPHATE DERIVATIVES, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2002 [2002/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YISSUM RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY OF THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSALEM 36 Jabotinsky Street Jerusalem 91042 / IL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | For all designated states YISSUM RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY OF THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSALEM 46 Jabotinsky Street Jerusalem 91042 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIROSH, Oren 13 Eliahu Hanavi Street 92503 Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
KATZHENDLER, Joshua 68 Hapalmach Street 92583 Jerusalem / IL | 03 /
GINSBURG, Isaac 22 Hataiassim Street 92509 Jerusalem / IL | 04 /
BARENHOLZ, Yehezkel 18 Neve Shaanan Street 93707 Jerusalem / IL | 05 /
KOHEN, Ron 30 Harav Berlin 92503 Jerusalem / IL | [1997/52] | Representative(s) | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Wales Swansea, Wales SA1 5ED / GB | ||
Former [1997/52] | Austin, Hedley William Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Swansea Wales SA1 5ED / GB | Application number, filing date | 95942875.6 | 13.11.1995 | [1997/52] | WO1995US15199 | Priority number, date | IL19940111797 | 28.11.1994 Original published format: IL 11179794 | [1997/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9616663 | Date: | 06.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0813415 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.06.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/66, C07F9/24, A61K7/00, A61K7/48 | [1998/17] | CPC: |
C07F9/2458 (EP);
A61K8/55 (EP);
A61Q17/00 (EP);
A61K2800/522 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/52] | A61K31/66, C07F9/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/52] | Title | German: | THIONOPHOSPHATDERIVATE, VERFAHREN FÜR IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE PRÄPARATE | [1997/52] | English: | THIONOPHOSPHATE DERIVATIVES, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM | [1997/52] | French: | DERIVES DE THIONOPHOSPHATE, PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES LES CONTENANT | [1997/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.1997 | Search fee paid | 19.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/52] | 21.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/11] | 24.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3670057 (TSUCHIYA HIROSHI, et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 61 and column 18, example 19 *; | [X] - GUO D ET AL, "Phase transfer catalytic synthesis of O,O-diethyl-N-hydrocarbyl phosphoramidothioates", POLYM. MATER. SCI. ENG. (PMSEDG,07430515);93; VOL.69,; PP.482-3, SHANDONG TEACHER'S UNIV.;DEP. OF CHEMISTRY; JINAN; 250014; PEOP. REP. CHINA (CN), XP002055302 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * | [X] - GUO D ET AL, "N-substituted-O,O-diethylphosphoramidothioates", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940829), vol. 121, no. 9, Database accession no. 109001, XP002055304 [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [X] - KAS'YANOVA E F ET AL, "Synthesis of some derivatives of monothiophosphoric acid for the flotation of ores of heavy nonferrous metals", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19690707), vol. 071, no. 1, Database accession no. 003242, XP002055305 [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [ ] - ZH. OBSHCH. KHIM. (ZOKHA4);69; VOL.39 (2); PP.365-6, USSR | [X] - KRONGAUZ Y I ET AL, "Reaction of thiophosphoric acid chlorides with ethanolamine", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19800331), vol. 092, no. 13, Database accession no. 110472, XP002055306 [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * | [ ] - NOV. KHIM. SREDSTVA ZASHCH. RAST. (42DUA7);79; PP.11-15, USSR | [X] - MANDEL'BAUM Y A ET AL, "Reaction of phosphorus thio acid chlorides with ethanolamine", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19761025), vol. 085, no. 17, Database accession no. 123267, XP002055307 [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * | [ ] - ZH. OBSHCH. KHIM. (ZOKHA4);76; VOL.46 (8); PP.1757-8, USSR | [A] - KELNER M.J., "Thioureas react with superoxide radicals to yield a sulfhydril compound", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY., MD US, (1990), vol. 265, no. 3, pages 1306 - 1311, XP002057035 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [T] - TIROSH O ET AL, "Antioxidant properties of amidothionophosphates: novel antioxidant molecules", FREE RADICAL BIOL. MED. (FRBMEH,08915849);96; VOL.20 (3); PP.421-32, HEBREW UNIV. JERUSALEM;DEP. PHARM.; JERUSALEM; ISRAEL (IL), XP002055303 [T] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0891-5849(96)02099-0 | International search | [X]US3087955 (BRUST HARRY F); | [X]US3251675 (SENKBEIL HERMAN O); | [X]US3337656 (CURTIS GEORGE G, et al); | [X]US3531550 (HERBER JOHN F, et al); | [X]US3597476 (EDWARD STEPHEN PAUL, et al); | [X]US3702332 (PILLON DANIEL, et al) |