EP0808325 - ANDROSTANE AND PREGNANE SERIES FOR ALLOSTERIC MODULATION OF GABA RECEPTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COCENSYS, INC. 213 Technology Drive Irvine, CA 92718 / US | [1997/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAN, Nancy, C. 522 Hermosa Street South Pasadena, CA 91030 / US | 02 /
GEE, Kelvin, W. 47 Urey Court Irvine, CA 92715 / US | 03 /
BOLGER, Michael, B. 3411 Rowena Drive Los Alamitos, CA 90720 / US | 04 /
TAHIR, Hasan F-396 Sarita Vihar New Delhi 110 044 / IN | 05 /
PURDY, Robert 7150 Shoreline Drive No. 3304 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 06 /
UPASANI, Ravindra, B. 63 Montecilo Fothill Ranch, CA 92610 / US | [2001/02] |
Former [1997/48] | 01 /
LAN, Nancy, C. 522 Hermosa Street South Pasadena, CA 91030 / US | ||
02 /
GEE, Kelvin, W. 47 Urey Court Irvine, CA 92715 / US | |||
03 /
BOLGER, Michael, B. 3411 Rowena Drive Los Alamitos, CA 90720 / US | |||
04 /
TAHIR, Hasan F-396 Sarita Vihar New Delhi 110 044 / IN | |||
05 /
PURDY, Robert 7150 Shoreline Drive 3304 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
06 /
UPASANI, Ravindra, B. 63 Montecilo Fothill Ranch, CA 92610 / US | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul William, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | Chapman, Paul William, et al Kilburn & Strode, 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 95942879.8 | 22.11.1995 | [1997/48] | WO1995US15210 | Priority number, date | US19940346926 | 23.11.1994 Original published format: US 346926 | [1997/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9616076 | Date: | 30.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0808325 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0808325 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07J9/00, C07J5/00, A61K31/56 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
C07J41/005 (EP);
A61P23/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/12 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
C07J5/0015 (EP);
C07J7/002 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/48] | Title | German: | ANDROSTAN- UND PREGNANSERIEN FÜR DIE ALLOSTERISCHE MODULATION DES GABA-REZEPTORS | [1997/48] | English: | ANDROSTANE AND PREGNANE SERIES FOR ALLOSTERIC MODULATION OF GABA RECEPTOR | [1997/48] | French: | SERIES DE L'ANDROSTANE ET DE LA PREGNANE PRODUISANT UNE MODULATION ALLOSTERIQUE DU RECEPTEUR DU GABA | [1997/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.1997 | Search fee paid | 20.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 16.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/02] | Request for further processing for: | 28.07.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 28.07.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.08.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 17.01.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3953429 (COOK MARTIN CHRISTOPHER, et al) [Y] 2,9-16 * examples 17-21 *; | [Y]WO9303732 (COCENSYS INC [US]) [Y] 2,9-16 * page 45 - page 46; examples 26-28 *; | [Y]WO9305786 (COCENSYS INC [US]) [Y] 2,9-16 * examples 5,6 *; | [PX]WO9427608 (COCENSYS INC [US]) [PX] 2,7,9-16* example 25 *; | [Y] - PHILLIPPS G H, "STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIPS IN STEROIDAL ANAESTHETICS", NOL. MECH. GEN. ANAESTH. GLAXO SYMPOSIUM, (19740101), pages 32 - 47, XP000600765 [Y] 2,9-16 * page 35, paragraph 3 * * page 37, compounds 21 and 22 * | [Y] - PHILLIPPS G H, "STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIPS IN STEROIDAL ANAESTHETICS", JOURNAL OF STEROID BIOCHEMISTRY, (197505), vol. 6, no. 5, pages 607 - 613, XP000600716 [Y] 2,9-16 * page 608, compounds XXIII and XXIV *; page 609, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-4731(75)90041-2 | [Y] - R. PURDY ET AL, "Synthesis, Metabolism and Pharmacological Activity of 3.alpha.-Hydroxy Steroids Which Potentiate GABA-Receptor Mediated Chloride Ion Uptake in Rat Cerebral Cortical Synaptoneurosomes", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., WASHINGTON US, (199006), vol. 33, no. 6, pages 1572 - 1581, XP002044395 [Y] 2,9-16 * page 1576, column 2; examples 3A,31; table II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00168a008 | International search | [A]US5120723 (GEE KELVIN W [US], et al); | [Y]US5232917 (BOLGER MICHAEL [US], et al); | [AP]US5371077 (SCHROEPFER JR GEORGE J [US], et al) |