EP0796538 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SCHEDULING BROADCAST OF AND ACCESS TO VIDEO PROGRAMS AND OTHER DATA USING CUSTOMER PROFILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herz, Frederick Condominium C-304, Herzwood, Canaan Valley Davis, WV 26260 / US | For all designated states Ungar, Lyle 321 South 20th Street Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | For all designated states Zhang, Jian Apartment 412E, 836 Cooper Landing Road Cherry Hill, NJ 08002 / US | For all designated states Wachob, David 8379 Glen Road Elkins Park, PA 19117 / US | For all designated states Salganicoff, Marcos 2425 Olive Street Philadelphia, PA 19130 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states Herz, Frederick Condominium C-304, Herzwood, Canaan Valley Davis, WV 26260 / US | ||
For all designated states Ungar, Lyle 321 South 20th Street Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | |||
For all designated states Zhang, Jian Apartment 412E, 836 Cooper Landing Road Cherry Hill, NJ 08002 / US | |||
For all designated states Wachob, David 8379 Glen Road Elkins Park, PA 19117 / US | |||
For all designated states Salganicoff, Marcos 2425 Olive Street Philadelphia, PA 19130 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95942920.0 | 29.11.1995 | [1997/39] | WO1995US15429 | Priority number, date | US19940346425 | 29.11.1994 Original published format: US 346425 | [1997/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9617467 | Date: | 06.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0796538 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0796538 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.09.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04N7/173 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
H04N21/44222 (EP,US);
H01H1/00 (US);
G06Q20/306 (EP);
G06Q20/383 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
H04H60/06 (EP,US);
H04H60/46 (EP,US);
H04L9/0662 (EP,US);
H04L9/0825 (EP,US);
H04N21/222 (EP,US);
H04N21/2223 (EP,US);
H04N21/23106 (EP,US);
H04N21/252 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/262 (EP,US);
H04N21/26241 (EP,US);
H04N21/26603 (EP,US);
H04N21/2668 (EP,US);
H04N21/4332 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/454 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/466 (EP,US);
H04N21/4665 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4755 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N7/14 (US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N7/165 (EP,US);
H04N7/1675 (EP,US);
H04N7/173 (EP,US);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US);
H04N7/17354 (EP,US);
G06F16/22 (US);
H04H60/31 (EP,US);
H04L2209/60 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99936 (US);
Y10S707/99939 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1997/39] | H04N7/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/39] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR RUNDFUNK- UND ZUGRIFFSPLANUNG VON VIDEOPROGRAMMEN UND ANDEREN DATEN MITTELS TEILNEHMERPROFILE | [1997/39] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SCHEDULING BROADCAST OF AND ACCESS TO VIDEO PROGRAMS AND OTHER DATA USING CUSTOMER PROFILES | [1997/39] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE PLANIFICATION DE LA DIFFUSION DE PROGRAMMES VIDEOS ET AUTRES TYPES DE DONNEES ET DE PLANIFICATION DE L'ACCES A CES DERNIERS AU MOYEN DE PROFILS CLIENTS | [1997/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.1997 | Search fee paid | 16.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 02.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 01.10.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 28.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.03.2004
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Leibnizstrasse 6 95447 Bayreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.03.2004
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Eichstädt, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | 08.04.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.12.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.10.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.10.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/15] | 11.11.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Request for further processing for: | 28.03.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 28.03.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.04.2003 | Decision despatched | 01.10.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.2002 | Decision despatched | 19.07.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 19.07.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.08.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.2003 | BE | 04.06.2003 | CH | 04.06.2003 | IT | 04.06.2003 | LI | 04.06.2003 | NL | 04.06.2003 | DK | 04.09.2003 | GR | 04.09.2003 | PT | 04.09.2003 | SE | 04.09.2003 | ES | 15.09.2003 | LU | 29.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | IE | 01.12.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/03] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
BE | 04.06.2003 | ||
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
DK | 04.09.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
LU | 29.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
IE | 01.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
BE | 04.06.2003 | ||
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
DK | 04.09.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
LU | 29.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
BE | 04.06.2003 | ||
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
DK | 04.09.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
LU | 29.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
BE | 04.06.2003 | ||
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
DK | 04.09.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
BE | 04.06.2003 | ||
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 04.06.2003 | |
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 04.06.2003 | |
LI | 04.06.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2678091 (MARTIN JUAN [FR]) [X] 1,11 * page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 6 * * page 5, line 3 - line 29 * [A] 2,12; | [XA]EP0572090 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1,3,11,13 * column 6, line 1 - line 23 * * column 7, line 22 - line 37 * [A] 2,8,12,18,24,25; | [XAY]WO9414284 (DISCOVERY COMMUNICAT INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9-11,13,14,16,17,19-22 * page 65, line 16 - line 21 * * page 67, line 18 - line 26 * * page 70, line 3 - line 23 * * page 71, line 20 - line 32 * * page 72, line 25 - page 73, line 10 * * page 78, line 9 - line 24 * [A] 2,12 [Y] 5,15; | [Y] - "METHOD OF CLASSIFICATION OF COMPLEX DATA ITEMS BY NEAREST NEIGHBORS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19940801), vol. 37, no. 8, page 335/336, XP000456442 [Y] 5,15 * page 335, paragraph 4 - page 336, paragraph 2 * | [PXA] - WITTIG H ET AL, "INTELLIGENT MEDIA AGENTS IN INTERACTIVE TELEVISION SYSTEMS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA COMPUTING AND SYSTEMS, (19950515), pages 182 - 189, XP000603484 [PX] 1,3,4,11,13,14 * page 183, column L, line 13 - line 23 * * page 185, column R, line 24 - page 186, column L, line 10 * * page 186, column R, line 33 - page 187, column L, line 6 * * page 187, column L, line 30 - column R, line 28 * [PA] 5,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MMCS.1995.484923 | International search | [XP]US5410344 (GRAVES GORDON T [US], et al) |