EP0811123 - GAS ACTUATED SLIDE VALVE IN A SCREW COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.2001 [2001/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN STANDARD INC. One Centennial Avenue, P.O. Box 6820 Piscataway, New Jersey 08855-6820 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states AMERICAN STANDARD INC. One Centennial Avenue, P.O. Box 6820 Piscataway, New Jersey 08855-6820 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAKOWSKE, Rodney, L. 1938 Nakomis Avenue La Crosse, WI 54603 / US | 02 /
BUTTERWORTH, Arthur, L. 2570 Mickel Road La Crosse, WI 54601 / US | 03 /
ANDERSEN, Garry, E. 2734 Longview Court La Crosse, WI 54601 / US | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95943005.9 | 06.12.1995 | [1997/50] | WO1995US15827 | Priority number, date | US19950393957 | 24.02.1995 Original published format: US 393957 | [1997/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9626368 | Date: | 29.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0811123 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0811123 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F04C29/10 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
F04C28/125 (EP,KR,US);
F04C2220/40 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S418/01 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/50] | Title | German: | GASDRUCKANGETRIEBENES STEUERVENTIL FÜR LEISTUNGSGEREGELTE SCHRAUBENVERDICHTER | [1997/50] | English: | GAS ACTUATED SLIDE VALVE IN A SCREW COMPRESSOR | [1997/50] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR A TIROIR ACTIONNE PAR UN GAZ POUR COMPRESSEUR A VIS | [1997/50] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 31.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB1335024 (HOWDEN GODFREY LTD) [X] 1,21 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,13,14,22-25; | [XA]GB2085080 (DUNHAM BUSH INC) [X] 1,13,21 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,14; | [A]GB2201735 (STAL REFRIGERATION AB) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2258887 (AMERICAN STANDARD INC [US]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0177234 (DUNHAM BUSH INC [US]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document * |