EP0770195 - PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING AN AUTOMATIC TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.1999 [1999/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOMIAN, Hans-Jörg Auf dem Ruhbühl 137 D-88090 Immenstaad / DE | 02 /
DREIBHOLZ, Ralf Dornierstrasse 35 D-88074 Meckenbeuren / DE | 03 /
FROTSCHER, Gerd Wasenöschstrasse 57 D-88048 Friedrichshafen / DE | 04 /
SCHOBER, Thomas Daimlerstrasse 24 D-88048 Friedrichshafen / DE | [1997/18] | Application number, filing date | 95943149.5 | 08.07.1995 | [1997/18] | WO1995EP02658 | Priority number, date | DE19944424456 | 12.07.1994 Original published format: DE 4424456 | [1997/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9601961 | Date: | 25.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0770195 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0770195 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/06 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
F16H61/061 (EP,US);
F16H61/06 (KR);
F16H61/702 (EP,US);
F16H2059/6807 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0255 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0451 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0492 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0496 (EP,US);
F16H2061/062 (EP,US);
F16H2306/32 (EP,US);
F16H2306/44 (EP,US);
F16H2306/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINES AUTOMATGETRIEBES | [1997/18] | English: | PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING AN AUTOMATIC TRANSMISSION | [1997/18] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UNE TRANSMISSION AUTOMATIQUE | [1997/18] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 28.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0498481 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1-15; | [A]EP0435378 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1-15; | [A]WO9412814 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 |