EP0801814 - WET CHEMICAL TREATMENT INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEAG MICROTECH GMBH Carl-Benz-Strasse 10 72124 Pliezhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states STEAG MicroTech GmbH Carl-Benz-Strasse 10 72124 Pliezhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DURST, Johann Baumsatzstrasse 34 D-72124 Pliezhausen / DE | 02 /
SIGEL, Holger Fischerstrasse 42 D-72124 Pliezhausen / DE | 03 /
SCHULZ, Werner Abt-Johannes-Strasse 21 D-73434 Aalen / DE | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/48] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95943224.6 | 29.12.1995 | [1997/43] | WO1995EP05153 | Priority number, date | DE19951000239 | 05.01.1995 Original published format: DE 19500239 | DE19951046990 | 15.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19546990 | [1997/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9621241 | Date: | 11.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0801814 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0801814 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
H01L21/67017 (EP,US);
H01L21/67781 (EP,US);
Y10S118/02 (EP,US);
Y10S134/902 (EP,US);
Y10S414/137 (EP,US);
Y10S414/14 (EP,US);
Y10S414/141 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/43] | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR CHEMISCHEN NASSBEHANDLUNG | [1997/43] | English: | WET CHEMICAL TREATMENT INSTALLATION | [1997/43] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT CHIMIQUE PAR VOIE HUMIDE | [1997/43] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 10.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 29.08.2001 | DK | 29.11.2001 | PT | 29.11.2001 | SE | 29.11.2001 | GR | 30.11.2001 | LU | 29.12.2001 | CH | 31.12.2001 | FR | 31.12.2001 | LI | 31.12.2001 | ES | 28.02.2002 | [2008/41] |
Former [2006/24] | IE | 29.08.2001 | |
DK | 29.11.2001 | ||
PT | 29.11.2001 | ||
SE | 29.11.2001 | ||
GR | 30.11.2001 | ||
LU | 29.12.2001 | ||
CH | 31.12.2001 | ||
LI | 31.12.2001 | ||
ES | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2004/51] | IE | 29.08.2001 | |
DK | 29.11.2001 | ||
PT | 29.11.2001 | ||
SE | 29.11.2001 | ||
GR | 30.11.2001 | ||
LU | 29.12.2001 | ||
CH | 31.12.2001 | ||
LI | 31.12.2001 | ||
FR | 25.01.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | IE | 29.08.2001 | |
DK | 29.11.2001 | ||
PT | 29.11.2001 | ||
SE | 29.11.2001 | ||
LU | 29.12.2001 | ||
CH | 31.12.2001 | ||
LI | 31.12.2001 | ||
FR | 25.01.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | IE | 29.08.2001 | |
DK | 29.11.2001 | ||
PT | 29.11.2001 | ||
SE | 29.11.2001 | ||
CH | 31.12.2001 | ||
LI | 31.12.2001 | ||
FR | 25.01.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | IE | 29.08.2001 | |
DK | 29.11.2001 | ||
PT | 29.11.2001 | ||
SE | 29.11.2001 | ||
CH | 31.12.2001 | ||
LI | 31.12.2001 | ||
FR | 25.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | IE | 29.08.2001 | |
PT | 29.11.2001 | ||
SE | 29.11.2001 | ||
CH | 31.12.2001 | ||
LI | 31.12.2001 | ||
FR | 25.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | IE | 29.08.2001 | |
PT | 29.11.2001 | ||
SE | 29.11.2001 | ||
CH | 31.12.2001 | ||
LI | 31.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | IE | 29.08.2001 | |
PT | 29.11.2001 | ||
SE | 29.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | PT | 29.11.2001 | |
SE | 29.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/20] | SE | 29.11.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2178594 (MCCONNELL CHRISTOPHER FRANK) [A] 1,16 * page 3, line 130 - page 4, line 33; figures 2A,2B *; | [A]FR2586658 (RECIF SA [FR]) [A] 1-4 * page 5 - page 8; figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0523836 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 19 - column 4, line 5; figures 1,8-12 *; | [A]US5301700 (KAMIKAWA YUUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * | Examination | US4722752 |