EP0800524 - 6-[TRIAZOLYL[ 3-(TRIFLUOROMETHYL)PHENYL]METHYL]-2-QUINOLINONES AND -QUINOLINETHIONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/42] | 6- TRIAZOLYL 3-(TRIFLUOROMETHYL)PHENYL]METHYL]-2-QUINOLINONES AND -QUINOLINETHIONES | ||
[2000/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENET, Marc, Gaston 10, square de Bourgogne F-76240 Le Mesnil-Esnard / FR | 02 /
MABIRE, Dominique, Jean-Pierre 14, rue Jean-Moulin F-27370 La Saussaye / FR | 03 /
SANZ, Gérard, Charles 6, rue Alfred-Dunet F-76240 Le Mesnil-Esnard / FR | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Quaghebeur, Luc, et al Johnson & Johnson Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Quaghebeur, Luc, et al Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Patent Department, Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Application number, filing date | 95943237.8 | 21.12.1995 | [1997/42] | WO1995EP05173 | Priority number, date | EP19940203773 | 28.12.1994 Original published format: EP 94203773 | [1997/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9620200 | Date: | 04.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0800524 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0800524 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D521/00, C07D401/06, A61K31/47 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/12 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D233/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/42] | Title | German: | 6-[TRIAZOLYL[3-(TRIFLUOROMETHYL)PHENYL]METHYL]-2-CHINOLINONE UND - CHINOLINONETHIONE | [2000/49] | English: | 6-[TRIAZOLYL[ 3-(TRIFLUOROMETHYL)PHENYL]METHYL]-2-QUINOLINONES AND -QUINOLINETHIONES | [2000/49] | French: | 6-[TRIAZOLYL[ 3-(TRIFLUOROMETHYL)PHENYL]METHYL]2-QUINOLINONES ET -QUINOLINETHIONES | [2000/49] |
Former [1997/42] | 6-[TRYAZOLYL[3-(TRIFLUOROMETHYL)PHENYL]METHYL]-2-QUINOLINONE UND - QUINOLINETHINE | ||
Former [1997/42] | 6- TRIAZOLYL 3-(TRIFLUOROMETHYL)PHENYL]METHYL]-2-QUINOLINONES AND -QUINOLINETHIONES | ||
Former [1997/42] | 6- TRIAZOLYL 3-(TRIFLUOROMETHYL)PHENYL]METHYL]2-QUINOLINES ET -QUINOLINETHIONES | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 30.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0260744 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]) [A] 1,6,10* the whole document *; | [AD]EP0371564 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]) [AD] 1,6,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0609963 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]) [A] 1,6,10 * the whole document * |