EP0746701 - TORSIONAL DAMPER COMPRISING A NUMBER OF FRICTION STAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO EMBRAYAGES s.a.s. 5, Avenue Roger Dumoulin 80009 Amiens Cedex 1 / FR | [2003/12] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states VALEO 43, rue Bayen 75848 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEFEVRE, Gérard 15, rue de l'Eglise, Vers/Selle F-80480 Saleux / FR | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Lemaire, Marc, et al VALEO TRANSMISSIONS, Service Propriété Industrielle, Le Triangle, 15, rue des Rosiers 93585 Saint Ouen Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | Lemaire, Marc, et al VALEO TRANSMISSIONS, Service Propriété Industrielle, Le Triangle, 15, rue des Rosiers 93585 Saint Ouen Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1996/50] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 95943255.0 | 21.12.1995 | [1996/50] | WO1995FR01708 | Priority number, date | FR19940015634 | 26.12.1994 Original published format: FR 9415634 | [1996/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9620357 | Date: | 04.07.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0746701 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0746701 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/129 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
F16F15/1292 (EP,US);
F16F15/129 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1996/50] | Title | German: | DREHSCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFER MIT MEHREREN REIBUNGSSTUFEN | [1996/50] | English: | TORSIONAL DAMPER COMPRISING A NUMBER OF FRICTION STAGES | [1996/50] | French: | AMORTISSEUR DE TORSION COMPORTANT PLUSIEURS ETAGES DE FROTTEMENT | [1996/50] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 10.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 31.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 15.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 14.10.1999 | Appeal received | 15.12.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.02.2000 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29] | Request for further processing for: | 31.03.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.04.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE4417660 (VALEO [FR]) [Y] 1,2,9 * column 2, line 26 - column 8, line 40; figure - * * column 5, line 49 - line 54 * [A] 3-5,7; | [Y]FR2365728 (FERODO SA [FR]) [Y] 1,2,9 * page 3, line 30 - page 12, line 33; figure - *; | [YA]FR2551153 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,4 * page 3, line 25 - page 6, line 36; figures 1-3 * [A] 2,3,5,6; | [YA]FR2532019 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,4 * page 3, line 10 - page 6, line 32; figure - * [A] 5,6; | [YA]GB2254398 (VALEO [FR]) [Y] 1,7,8 * page 4, line 16 - page 23, line 6; figure - * [A] 3,5; | [YA]DE2430160 (DAIMLER-BENZ AG) [Y] 1,7,8 * column 3, line 31 - column 6, line 35; figure - * [A] 3,4,6 |