EP0748326 - OPTICALLY ACTIVE DIPHOSPHINES AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME BY RESOLUTION OF THE RACEMIC MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODIA CHIMIE 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [1998/16] |
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHEY, François 9, boulevard Morland F-75004 Paris / FR | 02 /
ROBIN, Frédéric 30, rue Périer F-92120 Montrouge / FR | 03 /
MERCIER, François 5, impasse des Chantiers F-78000 Versailles / FR | 04 /
SPAGNOL, Michel 99, rue de la Part-Dieu F-69003 Lyon / FR | [1996/51] | Representative(s) | Dutruc-Rosset, Marie-Claude, et al Rhodia Services Direction Propriété Industrielle 40, Rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Dutruc-Rosset, Marie-Claude, et al RHODIA CHIMIE Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1996/51] | Dutruc-Rosset, Marie-Claude RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 25, Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95943260.0 | 22.12.1995 | [1996/51] | WO1995FR01716 | Priority number, date | FR19940015757 | 28.12.1994 Original published format: FR 9415757 | FR19950006286 | 29.05.1995 Original published format: FR 9506286 | [1996/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9620202 | Date: | 04.07.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0748326 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0748326 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/6568, C07F15/00, C07C51/36, C07B53/00, C07C57/00, // C07M7:00 | [1996/51] | CPC: |
C07F15/004 (EP,US);
C07B53/00 (EP,US);
C07C51/36 (EP,US);
C07F15/0053 (EP,US);
C07F15/0066 (EP,US);
C07F15/008 (EP,US);
C07F15/0093 (EP,US);
C07F9/65683 (EP,US);
B01J2231/645 (EP,US);
B01J2531/821 (EP,US);
B01J2531/822 (EP,US);
B01J31/2226 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C51/36, C07C59/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/51] | Title | German: | OPTISCH AKTIVE DIPHOSPHINE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DURCH AUFTRENNUNG DER RACEMATMISCHUNG | [1996/51] | English: | OPTICALLY ACTIVE DIPHOSPHINES AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME BY RESOLUTION OF THE RACEMIC MIXTURE | [1996/51] | French: | DIPHOSPHINES OPTIQUEMENT ACTIVES, LEUR PREPARATION PAR DEDOUBLEMENT DU MELANGE RACEMIQUE | [1996/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/51] | 13.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA] - BEVIERRE M O ET AL, "Mechanism of the thermal tetramerization of phospholes", BULL. SOC. CHIM. FR. (BSCFAS,00378968);92; VOL.129 (1); PP.1-8, EC. POLYTECH.;LAB. CHIM. PHOSPHORE MET. TRANSITION; PALAISEAU; 91128; FR. (FR) [DA] 1-38 * the whole document * |