EP0752152 - MULTI-AIR GAP MAGNETIC ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION "SNECMA" 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin F-75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states SOCIETE EUROPEENNE DE PROPULSION 24, rue Salomon de Rothschild 92150 Suresnes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAYE, Olivier Le Froc-de-Launay F-27950 La Chapelle-Reanville / FR | 02 /
CHILLET, Christian 2, digue du Drac F-38170 Seyssinet-Pariset / FR | 03 /
YONNET, Jean-Paul 24, rue Champ-Rochas F-38240 Meylan / FR | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1997/02] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95943267.5 | 22.12.1995 | [1997/02] | WO1995FR01723 | Priority number, date | FR19940015694 | 27.12.1994 Original published format: FR 9415694 | [1997/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9620488 | Date: | 04.07.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0752152 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0752152 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/13, H01F7/16, H01F7/14, H01H50/42 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
H01F7/14 (EP);
H01F7/13 (EP);
H01F7/1607 (EP);
H01H50/42 (EP);
H01F2007/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1997/02] | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHER BETÄTIGER MIT MEHRFACH LUFTSPALTEN | [1997/02] | English: | MULTI-AIR GAP MAGNETIC ACTUATOR | [1997/02] | French: | ACTIONNEUR MAGNETIQUE A ENTREFERS MULTIPLES | [1997/02] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 17.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2807451 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,5 * page 7, line 8 - page 8, line 30; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3844412 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH) [A] 1,5 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 50; figures 1-5 * |