EP0806127 - AN ENVIRONMENTALLY DESIRABLE PRINTED CIRCUIT AND ASSOCIATED APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/46] | AN ENVIRONMENTALLY DESIRABLE METHOD OF MANUFACTURING PRINTED CIRCUITS, PRINTED CIRCUITS MADE THEREBY AND ASSOCIATED APPARATUS | ||
[2001/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RESEARCH ORGANIZATION FOR CIRCUIT KNOWLEDGE 312 Height of Land Road, P.O. Box 180 Grafton, NH 03240 / US | [1997/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERTS, Joseph, A. 312 Height of Land Road, P.O. Box 180 Grafton, NH 03240 / US | [1997/46] | Representative(s) | Watts, Peter Graham Anthony Cundy & Co. 39/41 South Drive Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B75 7TE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | Watts, Peter Graham Anthony Cundy & Co., 1623 Warwick Road Knowle, Solihull, West Midlands B93 9LF / GB | Application number, filing date | 95943682.5 | 07.12.1995 | [1997/46] | WO1995US15809 | Priority number, date | US19940358855 | 19.12.1994 Original published format: US 358855 | [1997/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9619912 | Date: | 27.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0806127 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0806127 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.06.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/04 | [1999/16] | CPC: |
H01R31/00 (EP,US);
H05K3/045 (EP,US);
H05K3/4614 (EP,US);
H05K7/1451 (EP,US);
H05K9/0039 (EP,US);
H05K1/036 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0195 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0355 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0367 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0382 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0715 (EP,US);
H05K2203/025 (EP,US);
H05K2203/063 (EP,US);
H05K3/281 (EP,US);
H05K3/328 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/46] | H05K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/46] | Title | German: | UMWELTFREUNDLICH HERGESTELLTE LEITERPLATTE UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2001/34] | English: | AN ENVIRONMENTALLY DESIRABLE PRINTED CIRCUIT AND ASSOCIATED APPARATUS | [2001/34] | French: | CIRCUIT IMPRIME FAVORABLE A L'ENVIRONNEMENT ET LE DISPOSITIF ASSOCIE | [2001/34] |
Former [1997/46] | UMWELTFREUNDLICHES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LEITERPLATTEN, SO HERGESTELLTE LEITERPLATTEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [1997/46] | AN ENVIRONMENTALLY DESIRABLE METHOD OF MANUFACTURING PRINTED CIRCUITS, PRINTED CIRCUITS MADE THEREBY AND ASSOCIATED APPARATUS | ||
Former [1997/46] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CIRCUITS IMPRIMES SANS DANGER POUR L'ENVIRONNEMENT, CES CIRCUITS IMPRIMES ET LE DISPOSITIF ASSOCIE | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.1997 | Search fee paid | 14.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/46] | 23.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.06.2002 | BE | 05.06.2002 | CH | 05.06.2002 | GR | 05.06.2002 | IT | 05.06.2002 | LI | 05.06.2002 | NL | 05.06.2002 | DK | 05.09.2002 | PT | 05.09.2002 | SE | 05.09.2002 | GB | 07.12.2002 | LU | 07.12.2002 | IE | 09.12.2002 | ES | 20.12.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
BE | 05.06.2002 | ||
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
GB | 07.12.2002 | ||
LU | 07.12.2002 | ||
IE | 09.12.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
BE | 05.06.2002 | ||
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
GB | 07.12.2002 | ||
IE | 09.12.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
BE | 05.06.2002 | ||
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
IE | 09.12.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
BE | 05.06.2002 | ||
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
IE | 09.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
BE | 05.06.2002 | ||
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 05.06.2002 | |
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | SE | 05.09.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB725115 (ERIE RESISTOR CORP) [A] 11,12,14 * the whole document *; | [A]US3301730 (LAZARUS SPIWAK, et al) [A] 12,15 * column 3, line 35 - line 61; figures 4-7 *; | [X]US3410743 (SMITH JR JAMES, et al) [X] 1-3,12,13 * column W *; | [A]EP0423651 (PICHL FRITZ DIPL ING [CH]) [A] 12,14,15 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9316574 (ROCK LP [US]) [A] 7,11-15 * page 8, line 32 - page 10, line 16 * * page 18 - page 20, line 18 * * figures 3-6,16-19 *; | [A] - T.C. BABCOCK, "Minimizing nicks in active PC conductors", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (198305), vol. 25, no. 12, page 6574, XP002082244 [A] 11 * column W * | International search | [A]US2427144 (WILHELMUS JANSEN FRANCISCUS JO); | [A]US2837619 (SAMUEL STEIN); | [X]US2912745 (STEIGERWALT OLIVER I, et al); | [A]US2912748 (GRAY ROBERT B); | [A]US3488890 (OWENS JAMES L, et al); | [A]US4406062 (NAVARRO JOHN N [US]); | [A]US5097101 (TROBOUGH DOUGLAS W [US]) |