EP0796185 - Method of calculating wheel speed reference in an anti-lock braking system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/39] | VARIABLE DUTY CYCLE ANTILOCK BRAKING SYSTEM WITH ACCELEROMETER AND FAIL-SAFE | ||
[1998/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.1999 [1999/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOSCH BRAKING SYSTEMS CORPORATION 2800 South 25th Street Broadview, IL 60153 / US | [1997/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIVARD, Robert, M. 6651 Heatherwood Drive West Bloomfield, MI 48324 / US | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Michael, J. 251 Stathmore Bloomfield Township, MI 48304 / US | 03 /
PATTANTYUS, Tamas, I. 901 Cleveland Street Elyria, OH 44036 / US | 04 /
TOWERS, Kenneth, S. 51451 Oakwood Court Granger, IN 46530 / US | 05 /
PHIPPS, Jack, R. 336 Galway Road Britol, TN 37620 / US | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Bentz, Jean-Paul BOSCH SYSTEMES DE FREINAGE 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | Bentz, Jean-Paul BOSCH SYSTEMES DE FREINAGE, 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 95943717.9 | 11.12.1995 | [1997/39] | WO1995US15979 | Priority number, date | US19940353861 | 12.12.1994 Original published format: US 353861 | [1997/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9618532 | Date: | 20.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0796185 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0796185 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
B60T8/17636 (EP,US);
B60T8/445 (EP,US);
Y10S303/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Berechnung der Radreferenzgeschwindigkeit bei einer Antiblockierbremssystem | [1998/18] | English: | Method of calculating wheel speed reference in an anti-lock braking system | [1998/18] | French: | Prodédé pour calculer la vitesse de référence d'une roue dans un systeme anti-blocage | [1998/18] |
Former [1997/39] | ANTIBLOCKIERBREMSSYSTEM MIT VARIABLEM ARBEITSZYKLUS MIT BESCHLEUNIGUNGSMESSER UND AUSFALLSICHERUNG | ||
Former [1997/39] | VARIABLE DUTY CYCLE ANTILOCK BRAKING SYSTEM WITH ACCELEROMETER AND FAIL-SAFE | ||
Former [1997/39] | SYSTEME DE FREINAGE ANTI-BLOCAGE A CYCLE D'UTILISATION VARIABLE COMPORTANT UN ACCELEROMETRE ET UN DISPOSITIF DE SURETE INTEGREE | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.04.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 25.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0322911 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-3,7,9 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 36 * * column 4, line 29 - column 8, line 17 * * column 11, line 27 - column 13, line 19; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO9011214 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2,7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0618116 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,7 * page 10, line 33 - page 13, line 47 * * page 21, line 23 - line 34 * * page 24, line 2 - line 15; figures 1-12 * |