EP0808448 - OPTIMUM CONFIGURATION OF A 3 X 3 COUPLER FOR A FIBER OPTIC GYROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.05.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Litton Systems, Inc. 5500 Canoga Avenue Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states LITTON SYSTEMS, INC. 5500 Canoga Avenue Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRIEST, John, F. 22803 Wren Lane Tomball, TX 77375 / US | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire, AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | Maury, Richard Philip, et al Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Herts AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 95943772.4 | 08.12.1995 | [1997/48] | WO1995US16178 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9721981 | Date: | 19.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0808448 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/72, G02B6/28 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
G02B6/125 (EP);
G01C19/725 (EP);
G02B6/2804 (EP);
G02B2006/2865 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/48] | Title | German: | OPTIMALE KONFIGURATION EINES 3X3 KOPPLERS FÜR EINEN FASEROPTISCHEN KREISEL | [1997/48] | English: | OPTIMUM CONFIGURATION OF A 3 X 3 COUPLER FOR A FIBER OPTIC GYROSCOPE | [1997/48] | French: | CONFIGURATION OPTIMALE DE COUPLEUR 3 X 3 POUR GYROSCOPE A FIBRE OPTIQUE | [1997/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 07.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/29] | 28.02.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1999 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.2000 | 31.12.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - SHEEM S K, "Optical fiber interferometer with (3*3) directional couplers: analysis", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JUNE 1981, USA, ISSN 0021-8979, vol. 52, no. 6, pages 3865 - 3872, XP002007993 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.329853 | [A] - JA Y -H, "A SINGLE-MODE OPTICAL FIBER RING RESONATOR USING A PLANAR 3 X 3 FIBER COUPLER AND A SAGNAC LOOP", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, (19940801), vol. 12, no. 8, pages 1348 - 1354, XP000484308 [A] 1 * page 1349, column L, line 15 - line 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.317520 |