EP0799255 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF WATER-BORNE COATING COMPOSITIONS USING THERMOPLASTIC POLYHYDROXYETHER RESINS HAVING NARROW POLYDISPERSITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | For all designated states Eaton, Robert Francis 67 Mill Pond Road Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | For all designated states Johnson, Robert Norman 410 Anderson Avenue Phoenixville, PA 19460 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | ||
For all designated states Eaton, Robert Francis 67 Mill Pond Road Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | |||
For all designated states Johnson, Robert Norman 410 Anderson Avenue Phoenixville, PA 19460 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EATON, Robert, Francis 67 Mill Pond Road Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Robert, Norman 410 Anderson Avenue Phoenixville, PA 19460 / US | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95943898.7 | 19.12.1995 | [1997/41] | WO1995US16584 | Priority number, date | US19940363632 | 21.12.1994 Original published format: US 363632 | [1997/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9619508 | Date: | 27.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0799255 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0799255 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08F283/06 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
C08F283/06 (EP,US);
C09D151/08 (EP,US);
Y10S525/93 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WÄSSRIGEN BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS THERMOPLASTISCHEN POLYHYDROXYETHERHARZEN MIT ENGER POLYDISPERSITÄT | [1999/07] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF WATER-BORNE COATING COMPOSITIONS USING THERMOPLASTIC POLYHYDROXYETHER RESINS HAVING NARROW POLYDISPERSITY | [1997/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE COMPOSITIONS DE REVETEMENT PAR DISPERSION AQUEUSE AU MOYEN DE RESINES POLYHYDROXYETHER THERMOPLASTIQUES A POLYDISPERSITE ETROITE | [1997/41] |
Former [1997/41] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WÄSSRIGEN BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS THERMOPLASTISCHEN POLYHYDROXYETHERHARZEN MIT ENGER POLYDISPERSION | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 31.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH06293877 ; | [DX]US4355122 (FAN YOU-LING) [DX] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US4564648 (HUYBRECHTS JOZEF T [BE], et al) [X] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5231131 (CHU I CHENG [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 36 - line 41 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 02, Database accession no. 95-009692, XP002002757 & JPH06293877 A 19941021 (TOTO KASEI KK) [X] 1 * abstract * |