EP0800482 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CONCENTRATED WASTEWATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Petering, John L. 804 South Broad Street Mankato, MN 56001 / US | [1997/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | MacGregor, Gordon Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | MacGregor, Gordon ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95944209.6 | 22.12.1995 | [1997/42] | WO1995US16804 | Priority number, date | US19940364258 | 27.12.1994 Original published format: US 364258 | [1997/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9620138 | Date: | 04.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0800482 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0800482 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.07.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/30 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
C02F3/308 (EP,US);
Y10S210/903 (EP,US);
Y10S210/906 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/42] | Title | German: | METHODE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KONZENTRIERTEM ABWASSER | [1997/42] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CONCENTRATED WASTEWATER | [1997/42] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'EAUX RESIDUAIRES CHARGEES ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT | [1997/42] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.1997 | Search fee paid | 14.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 24.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 03.04.2002 | IT | 03.04.2002 | NL | 03.04.2002 | DK | 03.07.2002 | DE | 04.07.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | GB | 22.12.2002 | BE | 31.12.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 03.04.2002 | |
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
DE | 04.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
GB | 22.12.2002 | ||
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/22] | NL | 03.04.2002 | |
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
DE | 04.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
GB | 22.12.2002 | ||
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
FR | 03.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | NL | 03.04.2002 | |
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
DE | 04.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
FR | 03.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 03.04.2002 | |
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
DE | 04.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
FR | 03.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | NL | 03.04.2002 | |
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
DE | 04.07.2002 | ||
FR | 03.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | NL | 03.04.2002 | |
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
DE | 04.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 03.04.2002 | |
DE | 04.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 03.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE2550818 (FUNK MICHAEL) [X] 1,2,5,7-11,13,14,16 * page 8, paragraph 8 * * page 13, paragraph 2 * * page 17, paragraph 3 * * page 20, paragraph 2; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 12,15 [Y] 3,4,6; | [XA]FR2414025 (MALLET ENTREPRISE GLE CONST [FR]) [X] 13 * figure 1; claims 1-3,6-8 *[A] 14; | [X]US4272383 (MCGREW JAY L) [X] 13,14 * column 12, lines 30-44; claims 1,3-5,12,26 *; | [YA]DE4331927 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [Y] 3,4,6 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,4,5,7-16 | International search | [X]US4192742 (BEBIN JEAN [FR], et al); | [Y]US4415452 (HEIL RICHARD W [US], et al) |