EP0799504 - APPARATUS FOR SIMULATING HIGH BATTERY TEMPERATURE FOR RECHARGEABLE BATTERY SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1997/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERNANDEZ, Jose M. 640 Rosehill Lane Lawrenceville, GA 30244 / US | 02 /
MEADOWS, Vernon 4745 Bridgewater Drive Lilburn, GA 30247 / US | 03 /
GARRETT, Scott M. 840 Station View Run Lawrenceville, GA 30243 / US | 04 /
LAM, Dao N. 1857 N.W. 109 Avenue Plantation, FL 33322 / US | 05 /
KAMKE, James F. 153 W. Lincoln Avenue Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Morgan, Marc Motorola European IP Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Morgan, Marc Motorola Eur. Intel. Prop. Op., Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95944306.0 | 29.11.1995 | [1997/41] | WO1995US15480 | Priority number, date | US19940364583 | 27.12.1994 Original published format: US 364583 | [1997/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9620514 | Date: | 04.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0799504 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.07.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/48, H02J7/00, H02J7/10 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
H01M10/48 (EP,US);
H01M10/486 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/41] | H01M10/48 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/41] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR SIMULATION HOHER BATTERIETEMPERATUREN FÜR AUFLADBARE BATTERIESYSTEME | [1997/41] | English: | APPARATUS FOR SIMULATING HIGH BATTERY TEMPERATURE FOR RECHARGEABLE BATTERY SYSTEMS | [1997/41] | French: | APPAREIL DE SIMULATION DE TEMPERATURES ELEVEES DESTINE A DES ACCUMULATEURS RECHARGEABLES | [1997/41] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.1997 | Search fee paid | 28.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 29.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/27] | 25.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0588615 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11* page 5, column 32 - page 6, column 12; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0609101 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 4; figure 4 * | International search | [Y]US4303877 (MEINHOLD HENNER); | [YP]US5410238 (ISHIZUKA TAKAHITO [JP], et al) |