EP0796470 - IMPLEMENTATION INDEPENDENT EXTENSIBLE QUERY ARCHITECTURE FOR INFORMATION RETRIEVAL SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Excite, Inc. 555 Broadway Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states Excite, Inc. 555 Broadway Rdewood City, CA 94063 / US | ||
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states Excite, Inc. 1091 North Shoreline Boulevard Mountain View, California 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPENCER, Graham 10280 Lockwood Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95944342.5 | 07.12.1995 | [1997/39] | WO1995US16496 | Priority number, date | US19940350967 | 07.12.1994 Original published format: US 350967 | [1997/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9618159 | Date: | 13.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0796470 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0796470 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
G06F16/334 (EP,US);
G06F16/24542 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99935 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/39] | Title | German: | IMPLEMENTIERUNGSUNABHÄNGIGE ERWEITERBARE ABFRAGEARCHITEKTUR FÜR SYSTEME ZUR INFORMATIONSWIEDERAUFFINDUNG | [1997/39] | English: | IMPLEMENTATION INDEPENDENT EXTENSIBLE QUERY ARCHITECTURE FOR INFORMATION RETRIEVAL SYSTEMS | [1997/39] | French: | ARCHITECTURE D'INTERROGATION EXTENSIBLE ET INDEPENDANTE DE L'IMPLANTATION, DESTINEE AUX SYSTEMES DE RECHERCHE DOCUMENTAIRE | [1997/39] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 22.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.04.1999 | CH | 14.04.1999 | GR | 14.04.1999 | LI | 14.04.1999 | SE | 14.04.1999 | DK | 14.07.1999 | PT | 14.07.1999 | IE | 07.12.1999 | LU | 07.12.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/46] | BE | 14.04.1999 | |
CH | 14.04.1999 | ||
GR | 14.04.1999 | ||
LI | 14.04.1999 | ||
SE | 14.04.1999 | ||
DK | 14.07.1999 | ||
PT | 14.07.1999 | ||
IE | 07.12.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | BE | 14.04.1999 | |
CH | 14.04.1999 | ||
GR | 14.04.1999 | ||
LI | 14.04.1999 | ||
SE | 14.04.1999 | ||
PT | 14.07.1999 | ||
IE | 07.12.1999 | ||
MC | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | BE | 14.04.1999 | |
CH | 14.04.1999 | ||
GR | 14.04.1999 | ||
LI | 14.04.1999 | ||
SE | 14.04.1999 | ||
PT | 14.07.1999 | ||
IE | 07.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | BE | 14.04.1999 | |
CH | 14.04.1999 | ||
GR | 14.04.1999 | ||
LI | 14.04.1999 | ||
PT | 14.07.1999 | ||
IE | 07.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | BE | 14.04.1999 | |
CH | 14.04.1999 | ||
LI | 14.04.1999 | ||
PT | 14.07.1999 | ||
IE | 07.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | BE | 14.04.1999 | |
CH | 14.04.1999 | ||
LI | 14.04.1999 | ||
PT | 14.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 14.04.1999 | |
PT | 14.07.1999 | ||
CH | 20.07.1999 | ||
LI | 20.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | BE | 14.04.1999 | |
PT | 14.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 14.04.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A] - PAEPCKE A, "AN OBJECT-ORIENTED VIEW ONTO PUBLIC, HETEROGENEOUS TEXT DATABASES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATA ENGINEERING, VIENNA, APR. 19 - 23, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19930419), no. CONF. 9, pages 484 - 493, XP000380206 [A] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDE.1993.344031 | [A] - VRBSKY S V ET AL, "AN OBJECT-ORIENTED QUERY PROCESSOR THAT PRODUCES MONOTONICALLY IMPROVING APPROXIMATE ANSWERS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATA ENGINEERING, KOBE, JP, APRIL 8 - 12, 1991, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19910408), no. CONF. 7, pages 472 - 481, XP000325909 [A] 1 * page 474, column R, line 20 - page 475, column L, line 9 * * page 478, column R, paragraph 4 - page 480, column L, paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDE.1991.131496 |