EP0870012 - EXPANSION OF BONE MARROW STROMAL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alg Company 734 Forest Street Marlborough, MA 01721 / US | [1998/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREENBERGER, Joel, S. 749 Chestnut Road Sewickley, PA 15143 / US | 02 /
HURWITZ, David, R. 10 Deergrass Lane Acton, MA 01720 / US | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Vossius, Volker, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | Vossius, Volker, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95944686.5 | 29.12.1995 | [1998/42] | WO1995US17073 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9724434 | Date: | 10.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0870012 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0870012 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.07.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
C12N5/0669 (EP,US);
C12N2501/113 (EP,US);
C12N2501/91 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/42] | Title | German: | VERMEHRUNG VON KNOCHENMARKSSTÜTZZELLEN | [1998/42] | English: | EXPANSION OF BONE MARROW STROMAL CELLS | [1998/42] | French: | EXPANSION DE CELLULES DE STROMA DE MOELLE OSSEUSE | [1998/42] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.1998 | Search fee paid | 29.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 29.06.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 27.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 29.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01110886.7 / EP1120462 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.08.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.08.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.11.2001 | BE | 14.11.2001 | CH | 14.11.2001 | FR | 14.11.2001 | GR | 14.11.2001 | IT | 14.11.2001 | LI | 14.11.2001 | NL | 14.11.2001 | LU | 29.12.2001 | MC | 29.12.2001 | IE | 31.12.2001 | DK | 14.02.2002 | PT | 14.02.2002 | SE | 14.02.2002 | ES | 30.05.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/29] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
BE | 14.11.2001 | ||
CH | 14.11.2001 | ||
FR | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
LU | 29.12.2001 | ||
MC | 29.12.2001 | ||
IE | 31.12.2001 | ||
DK | 14.02.2002 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
BE | 14.11.2001 | ||
CH | 14.11.2001 | ||
FR | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
MC | 29.12.2001 | ||
IE | 31.12.2001 | ||
DK | 14.02.2002 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2004/42] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
BE | 14.11.2001 | ||
CH | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
MC | 29.12.2001 | ||
IE | 31.12.2001 | ||
DK | 14.02.2002 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
BE | 14.11.2001 | ||
CH | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
MC | 29.12.2001 | ||
DK | 14.02.2002 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
BE | 14.11.2001 | ||
CH | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
MC | 29.12.2001 | ||
DK | 14.02.2002 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
BE | 14.11.2001 | ||
CH | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
MC | 29.12.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 14.11.2001 | |
CH | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
MC | 29.12.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 14.11.2001 | |
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
LI | 14.11.2001 | ||
MC | 29.12.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 14.11.2001 | |
MC | 29.12.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | MC | 29.12.2001 | |
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/43] | MC | 29.12.2001 | |
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 14.02.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US5474687 (VAN VLASSELAER PETER [US]); | [YE]US5486359 (CAPLAN ARNOLD I [US], et al); | [Y]US5198356 (LIEBERMAN MICHAEL A [US], et al); | [Y]US5453357 (HOGAN BRIGID L M [US]); | [A]US5328844 (MOORE GEORGE E [US]); | [A]US5256560 (LAWMAN MICHAEL J P [US], et al); | [Y]US5408041 (MUNDY GREGORY R [US], et al); | [Y]US5460964 (MCGLAVE PHILIP B [US], et al); | [A]US5324656 (HAM RICHARD G [US], et al) | [Y] - SIGMA CELL CULTURE 1994 CATALOGUE & PRICE LIST, pages 31-34, 45-50, 58-62, 75, 76, 81. |