EP0846285 - METHOD AND SECURITY SYSTEM FOR ENSURING THE SECURITY OF A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weisz, Herman Cogels-Osylei 33 2600 Berchem / BE | For all designated states Lo Piano, Ornella Via Oddo delle Colonne Is.O 98100 Messina / IT | [1998/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | Callewaert, Jean, et al Bureau Callewaert b.v.b.a. Brusselsesteenweg 108 3090 Overijse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | Callewaert, Jean, et al Bureau Callewaert p.v.b.a. Brusselsesteenweg 108 3090 Overijse / BE | Application number, filing date | 95944706.1 | 12.02.1996 | [1998/24] | WO1995EP05181 | Priority number, date | BE19950000386 | 27.04.1995 Original published format: BE 9500386 | BE19950000805 | 28.09.1995 Original published format: BE 9500805 | [1998/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9634328 | Date: | 31.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0846285 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, G07C9/00 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G06F21/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1998/42] |
Former [1998/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SICHERHEITSSYSTEM ZUR GEWÄHRLEISTUNG DER SICHERHEIT EINES GERÄTS | [2000/36] | English: | METHOD AND SECURITY SYSTEM FOR ENSURING THE SECURITY OF A DEVICE | [1998/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DESTINE A ASSURER LA PROTECTION D'UN DISPOSITIF | [1998/24] |
Former [1998/24] | VERFAHREN UND SICHERHEITSSYSTEM ZUR SICHERSTELLUNG EINES GERÄTS | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 23.03.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, DK, GR, IE, MC, PT | 20.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/21] | 23.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/21] | Request for further processing for: | 26.05.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 27.05.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.02.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.1998 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   16.02.1998 | 11.02.1998 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   16.02.1998 | 11.02.1998 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.02.1998 | 11.02.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.1998 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   16.02.1998 | 11.02.1998 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.02.1998 | 11.02.1998 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.02.1998 | 11.02.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.1998 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   16.02.1998 | 11.02.1998 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   16.02.1998 | 11.02.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.1998 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   16.02.1998 | 11.02.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.1998 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   16.02.1998 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.02.1998 | M01   Fee paid on   16.02.1998 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.04.1998 | 28.02.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8503785 (GORDIAN SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [DX]US4679236 (DAVIES RICHARD E [US]) [DX] 1-5,8,11,12,18,20,22,24-27 * column A; figures 1,2,5,6 * * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 66 * * column 5, line 63 - column 7, line 3 * * column 9, line 31 - line 62 *; | [DA]DE3904215 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [DA] 1-28 * abstract * * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 66 *; | [A]US5163097 (PEGG TINA C [US]); | [DA]US5177789 (COVERT JOHN R [US]) [DA] 1-28 * column W * |