EP0723753 - A blocking mechanism for an adjustable back of a chair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sedus Stoll AG Brückenstrasse 15 79761 Waldshut-Tiengen / DE | [1996/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bieselt, Rolf Rappensteinstr. 55 D-79725 Laufenburg / DE | 02 /
Hergesell, Harald Günnetsmättle 28 D-79733 Görwihl / DE | 03 /
Zwetz, Martin Wolfsackerweg 24 D-79761 Waldshut / DE | [1996/31] | Representative(s) | Lück, Gert Schulstrasse 2 79862 Höchenschwand / DE | [2009/40] |
Former [1997/15] | Lück, Gert, Dr. Patentanwalt, Langenweg 11 79761 Waldshut / DE | ||
Former [1996/31] | Lück, Gert, Dr. rer. nat. Postfach 1 31 D-79860 Höchenschwand / DE | Application number, filing date | 96100027.0 | 03.01.1996 | [1996/31] | Priority number, date | DE1995102649 | 28.01.1995 Original published format: DE 19502649 | [1996/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0723753 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0723753 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47C1/026 | [1996/31] | CPC: |
A47C1/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/31] | Title | German: | Arretiermechanik für die neigbare Lehne eines Stuhles | [1996/31] | English: | A blocking mechanism for an adjustable back of a chair | [1996/31] | French: | Mécanisme de blocage pour dossier réglable d'une chaise | [1996/31] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 10.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE807314 (PANNES PATENT POLSTERMOEBEL); | [A]DE2338142 (WILDE & SPIETH); | [A]DE2931915 (KEIPER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH) [A] 1,4 * page 7, line 7 - page 10; figure - *; | [A]EP0052832 (PROTONED BV [NL]) [A] 1-3 * figure -; claim 1 * |