EP0720981 - Cyclohexyloxycarbonylacetohydrazides and method for producing 1H-1,2,4-triazoles using the hydrazides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Takayuki, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Shimada, Yasuhiro, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Katsumata, Taiji, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96100116.1 | 05.01.1996 | [1996/28] | Priority number, date | JP19950015481 | 05.01.1995 Original published format: JP 1548195 | [1996/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0720981 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0720981 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C243/28, C07D249/08, C07D487/04, G03C7/38 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
C07D249/08 (EP);
C07C243/28 (EP);
C07C69/38 (EP);
C07D403/06 (EP);
C07D487/04 (EP);
G03C7/383 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, NL [1996/28] | Title | German: | Cyclohexyloxycarbonylacetohydrazide, und ihre Verwendung für die Herstellung von 1H-1,2,4-Triazolen | [1996/28] | English: | Cyclohexyloxycarbonylacetohydrazides and method for producing 1H-1,2,4-triazoles using the hydrazides | [1996/28] | French: | Cyclohexyloxycarbonylacétohydrazides et leur utilisation pour la préparation des 1H-1,2,4-triazoles | [1996/28] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 08.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 14.10.1998 | [2003/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0628867 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO. LTD.) [DA] 1-5 * page 39, line 33 - line 36; example -; claim - *; | [DA]EP0518238 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO. LTD.) [DA] 1-5 * page 46, line 50 - line 52; example -; claim - *; | [DA]EP0491197 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO. LTD.) [DA] 1-5 * example -; claim - * | [DA] - E. J. BROWNE ET. AL., "Triazoles. Part VII. Synthesis of Substituted 1,2,4-Triazoles.", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, LONDON, GB, pages 5149 - 52 [DA] 1-5 * whole document * |