EP0722040 - Engine exhaust pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.1999 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.1999 [1999/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwata, Minoru 527, Imazato Susono-shi, Sizuoka-ken, 410-11 / JP | 02 /
Ito, Yoshiaki 30-1, Nagashino, Kamishigehara-cho Chiryu-shi, Aichi-ken 472 / JP | 03 /
Harada, Kenichi 2-7-2, Senpukugaoka Susono-shi, Sizuoka-ken 410-11 / JP | [1996/29] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96100220.1 | 09.01.1996 | [1996/29] | Priority number, date | JP19950004328 | 13.01.1995 Original published format: JP 432895 | JP19950280925 | 27.10.1995 Original published format: JP 28092595 | [1996/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0722040 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0722040 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | [1996/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F01N7/08, F01N7/14 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
F01N13/008 (EP,US);
F01N13/08 (EP,KR,US);
F01N13/14 (EP,US);
F01N13/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/29] | Title | German: | Auspuffleitung eines Motors | [1996/29] | English: | Engine exhaust pipe | [1996/29] | French: | Tuyau d'échappement d'un moteur | [1996/29] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 21.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/51] | 28.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4212505 (ZEUNA STAERKER) [X] 1-4,6,9,10 * column 2, line 2 - line 18 * * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 54; figures 1-6 * [Y] 7,8,11; | [Y]US4747624 (FABER BERND [DE], et al) [Y] 7 * abstract *; | [YA]DE4100935 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 8 * figure -; claim 1 * [A] 10,11; | [Y]US4969445 (HERTWECK GERNOT [DE], et al) [Y] 11 * abstract * |