EP0723154 - Flame ionization detector with flame tip on diffuser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.1999 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2001 | Change - applicant | published on 11.07.2001 [2001/28] | 24.05.2001 | Change - representative | published on 11.07.2001 [2001/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSENSOR TECHNOLOGY, INC. 41762 Christy Street Fremont, California 94538 / US | [1996/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lo, Chi K. 39600 Fremont Boulevard, Apt. 82 Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [1996/30] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/30] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96100415.7 | 12.01.1996 | [1996/30] | Priority number, date | US19950375330 | 17.01.1995 Original published format: US 375330 | [1996/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0723154 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0723154 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/68, G01N27/62 | [1996/30] | CPC: |
G01N30/68 (EP,US);
G01N2030/0095 (EP,US);
G01N2030/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/30] | Title | German: | Flammenionisationsdetektor mit Flammenspitze auf dem Diffusor | [1996/30] | English: | Flame ionization detector with flame tip on diffuser | [1996/30] | French: | Détecteur à ionisation de flamme avec le bout de la flamme sur le diffuseur | [1996/30] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/27] | 10.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.11.1998 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3542516 (CLARDY EDWIN K) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 64-70 *; | [A]US3545936 (JENTZSCH DIETRICH, et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US3905755 (ASKE LEONARD E) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4182740 (HARTMANN CHARLES H [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]WO8901149 (CAMBUSTION HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A] - GALLAGHER M M ET AL, "SHEATHED-FLOW HYDROGEN ATMOSPHERE FLAME IONIZATION DETECTOR FOR GAS CHROMATOGRAPHY", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19901005), vol. 518, no. 2, pages 297 - 305, XP000168085 [A] 1,2,14,16,20 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(01)93191-7 | [A] - BERG J R ET AL, "AN IMPROVED FID DESIGN FOR CAPILLARY GC", INTERNATIONAL LABORATORY, SHELTON, CT, US, (19920501), vol. 22, no. 5, page 10, 12, 14, XP000288398 [A] 1,5 * figure 1 * | [A] - J. B. ANGELL ET AL., "Silicon Micromechanical Devices", SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, (198304), vol. 248, no. 4, pages 36 - 47, XP002054686 [A] 22 * the whole document * |