EP0727878 - Circuit for A/D conversion of a video RF or IF signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46 quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | [2002/24] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46, Quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1996/34] | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia S.A. 9, place des Vosges, La Défense 5 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boie, Werner 8, rue de Zehnacker F-67200 Strasbourg / FR | [1996/34] | Representative(s) | Hartnack, Wolfgang, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Hartnack, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1996/34] | Hartnack, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patentabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 96100476.9 | 15.01.1996 | [1996/34] | Priority number, date | EP19950400129 | 23.01.1995 Original published format: EP 95400129 | [1996/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0727878 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0727878 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | [1996/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0727878 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/14, H03M1/06, H04N5/44 | [1996/34] | CPC: |
H03M1/1038 (EP);
H03M1/1047 (EP);
H03M1/164 (EP);
H03M1/20 (EP);
H04N5/4446 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/34] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur A/D-Umsetzung eines Videosignals mit Hoch- oder Zwischenfrequenz | [1996/34] | English: | Circuit for A/D conversion of a video RF or IF signal | [1996/34] | French: | Circuit pour la conversion analogique/numérique d'un signal vidéo à fréquence radio ou à fréquence intermédiaire | [1996/34] | Examination procedure | 07.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 30.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9003066 (ANALOG DEVICES INC.) [X] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 12 * [A] 6; | [XA]US4008468 (IMHOFF C. ET AL) [X] 1 * column W * [A] 6; | [A]US4502078 (STECKLER S. ET AL) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0321681 (DEUTSCHE ITT INDUSTRIES GMBH) [A] 1 * column W *; | [X]EP0488282 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [X] 3 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4903023 (EVANS WILLIAM P ET AL) [A] 4 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5182558 (MAYO FRANK) [A] 4 * figure 1 * | [DA] - GOODENOUGH F., "12-Bit IC ADCs SAMPLE SIGNALS AT UP TO 20MHZ", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, HASBROUCK HEIGHTS, NEW JERSEY US, (19911024), pages 47 - 59, XP000265950 [DA] 1 * column W * | [X] - CONNOLLY J J ET AL, "A monolithic 12b+sign successive approximation A/D converter", 1980 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS, PHILADELPHIA, PA, USA, 13-15 FEB. 1980, 1980, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 12 - 13, XP002012040 [X] 3 * page 12, column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 6; figure 2 * | [X] - MILLER G A ET AL, "A true 16 b self-calibrating BiCMOS DAC", 1993 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. ISSCC. FIRST EDITION (CAT. NO.93CH3272-2), PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE INTERNATIONAL SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE - ISSCC '93, SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA, 24-26 FEB. 1993, ISBN 0-7803-0987-1, 1993, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 58 - 59, 263, XP002012041 [X] 3 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSCC.1993.280085 |