EP0723269 - Semiconductor memory device having positive feedback sense amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1996/30] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kohno, Takaki c/o Nec Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1996/30] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/30] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96100645.9 | 17.01.1996 | [1996/30] | Priority number, date | JP19950026177 | 20.01.1995 Original published format: JP 2617795 | [1996/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0723269 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0723269 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | [1999/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0723269 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/06, G11C7/06 | [1996/30] | CPC: |
G11C16/26 (EP,US);
G11C11/407 (KR);
G11C7/067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/30] | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeicheranordnung mit Leseverstärker, der positive Rückkopplung besitzt | [1996/30] | English: | Semiconductor memory device having positive feedback sense amplifier | [1996/30] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire à semi-conducteurs avec amplificateur de détection à réaction positive | [1996/30] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 13.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4763026 (TSEN CHAN-TANG [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6,8,9,11 * column 4, line 13 - column 7, line 51; figure 7 *; | [A]EP0572240 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,7,8 * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 54; figures 2,4 *; | [A]US5022003 (KOHNO TAKAKI [JP]) [A] 1,4,5,8 * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 52; figures 1,4 * |