EP0742361 - Method for determining the fuel quantity fed by an injection pump to fuel injectors in a diesel engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1996/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoeckel, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Hannes-Tobel-Str. 2/1 D-73262 Reichenbach / DE | 02 /
Kaelberer, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Bodelshofer Weg 89 D-73230 Kirchheim / DE | [2002/16] |
Former [1996/46] | 01 /
Hoeckel, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Hannes-Tobel-Str. 2/1 D-73262 Reichenbach / DE | ||
02 /
Kaelberer, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Bodelhofer Weg 89 D-73230 Kirchheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 96100863.8 | 23.01.1996 | [1996/46] | Priority number, date | DE1995116923 | 09.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19516923 | [1996/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0742361 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0742361 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742361 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/38 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
F02D41/28 (EP);
F02D41/38 (EP);
F02D2041/223 (EP);
F02D2200/0602 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erfassen der von einer Einspritzpumpe eines Dieselmotors über die Einspritzdüsen geförderten Kraftstoffmenge | [1996/46] | English: | Method for determining the fuel quantity fed by an injection pump to fuel injectors in a diesel engine | [1996/46] | French: | Méthode pour déterminer la quantité de carburant fourni par une pompe à injection vers des buses d'injection dans un moteur diesel | [1996/46] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 15.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3118425 (BOSCH) [AD] 1,6,9,11 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH06280717 ; | [A]EP0228621 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,9,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 095, no. 001, & JP06280717 A 19941004 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,6,9,11 * abstract * | [A] - POTZ D ET AL, "KORRELATIONSVERFAHREN ZUR EINSPRITZMENGENMESSUNG", MTZ MOTORTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, (19900701), vol. 51, no. 7 / 08, pages 298 - 304, XP000147934 [A] 1,6,9,11 * column A * |