EP0724357 - An imaging device using asymmetrical timing for pixel summing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1996/31] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manning, Thomas J., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1996/31] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2002/16] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited (W92) Patents Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2001/20] | Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing, et al Kodak GmbH, Patent Department (4494) 70324 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1996/31] | Schmidt, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al KODAK Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96100882.8 | 23.01.1996 | [1996/31] | Priority number, date | US19950380486 | 30.01.1995 Original published format: US 380486 | [1996/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0724357 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0724357 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/15, H04N5/335 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
H04N25/00 (EP,US);
H04N25/46 (EP,US);
H04N25/71 (EP,US);
H04N25/745 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/31] | H04N3/15 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/31] | Title | German: | Abbildungssystem mit asymmetrischer Zeitzählung für die Pixel-Summierung | [1996/31] | English: | An imaging device using asymmetrical timing for pixel summing | [1996/31] | French: | Système d'image avec synchronisation asymétrique pour l'addition des points d'image | [1996/31] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 11.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/13] | 26.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0588493 (SONY CORP [JP]) |