EP0786294 - Joint structure for metal plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enami Seiki Mfg. Co., Ltd. 3 Wakabayashi-cho 2-chome Yao-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states Enami Seiki Mfg. Co., Ltd. 3 Wakabayashi-cho 2-chome Yao-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Enami, Toshiaki 2410-16, Azayukinaga Maiduru-shi, Kyoto / JP | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Wolfgang Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner, Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96101126.9 | 26.01.1996 | [1997/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786294 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786294 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B21D39/03, F16B5/00 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
B21D39/03 (EP,US);
F16B5/0012 (EP,US);
F16B5/045 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49915 (EP,US);
Y10T403/49 (EP,US);
Y10T403/4966 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/31] | Title | German: | Verbindungsanordnung für Metallplatten | [1997/31] | English: | Joint structure for metal plates | [1997/31] | French: | Structure de joint pour des tôles | [1997/31] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/31] | 18.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 04.04.2001 | SE | 04.07.2001 | ES | 30.10.2001 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/09] | NL | 04.04.2001 | |
SE | 04.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 04.07.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS5533809 ; | [XA]JPS57190737 ; | [XA]JPS5533809 (OTA KINJIROU) [X] 1 * figure - * [A] 2-4; | [XA]JPS57190737 (KAMAKARI RIYOUTA) [X] 1 * figure - * [A] 2-4; | [X]US4734971 (DUPASQUIER ROBERT L [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0278998 (ENAMI SEIKI KK [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800521), vol. 004, no. 068, Database accession no. (M - 012), & JP55033809 A 19800310 (OOTA KINJIRO) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-4 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830218), vol. 007, no. 041, Database accession no. (M - 194), & JP57190737 A 19821124 (RIYOUTA KAMAKARI) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-4 |