EP0724991 - Windscreen wiper with improved means for demounting its drive head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage Service Propriété Industrielle 8 Rue Louis Lormand CS 90581 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES D'ESSUYAGE Z.A. de l'Agiot, 8 rue Louis Lormand 78321 La Verrière / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eustache, Jean-Pierre 5 rue Albert Camus F-92160 Antony / FR | 02 /
Viaene, Alain 10 Allée des Boutons d'Or F-78180 Montigny-le-Bretonneux / FR | 03 /
Berge, Gilles 29 rue Maurice Dechy F-78120 Rambouillet / FR | [1996/32] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier, et al Valeo Management Services Propriété Industrielle 2 Rue Andrée Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | Gamonal, Didier, et al Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 96101199.6 | 29.01.1996 | [1996/32] | Priority number, date | FR19950001316 | 31.01.1995 Original published format: FR 9501316 | [1996/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724991 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/34 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
B60S1/3459 (EP);
B60S1/34 (EP);
F16D1/092 (EP);
B60S1/3436 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1996/32] | Title | German: | Scheibenwischer mit verbesserten Mitteln zur Demontage seines Antriebskopfes | [1996/32] | English: | Windscreen wiper with improved means for demounting its drive head | [1996/32] | French: | Dispositif d'essuie-glace comportant des moyens perfectionnés de démontage de sa tête d'entraînement | [1996/32] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 14.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/09] | 10.10.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/09] | Request for further processing for: | 11.02.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 18.02.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.03.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB637671 (PRODUCTIVE INVENTIONS) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]DE1099875 (ANDERSON) [X] 1 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 32; figure 3 *; | [PX]DE4408732 (ITT AUTOMOTIVE) [PX] 1 * the whole document * |