EP0727560 - Casing rotating device for drilling machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASAGRANDE SpA Viale Venezia, 97 I-33074 Fontanafredda (PN) / IT | [1996/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casagrande, Sergio Via Cavour 18 33074 Fontanafredda (PN) / IT | [1996/34] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 96101254.9 | 30.01.1996 | [1996/34] | Priority number, date | IT1995UD00022 | 16.02.1995 Original published format: IT UD950022 | [1996/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0727560 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0727560 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0727560 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E21B3/02, E21B7/20 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
E21B3/025 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/34] | E21B3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, PT [1996/34] | Extension states | SI | 30.01.1996 | Title | German: | Futterrohr-Drehvorrichtung für Bohrmaschine | [1996/34] | English: | Casing rotating device for drilling machines | [1996/34] | French: | Dispositif de mise en rotation d'un cuvelage pour machine de forage | [1996/34] | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 28.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 19.05.1998 | Observations by third parties | 08.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 19.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.04.2001 | BE | 04.04.2001 | CH | 04.04.2001 | FR | 04.04.2001 | IT | 04.04.2001 | LI | 04.04.2001 | PT | 04.07.2001 | GR | 06.07.2001 | ES | 30.10.2001 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 04.04.2001 | |
BE | 04.04.2001 | ||
CH | 04.04.2001 | ||
FR | 04.04.2001 | ||
LI | 04.04.2001 | ||
PT | 04.07.2001 | ||
GR | 06.07.2001 | ||
ES | 30.10.2001 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 04.04.2001 | |
BE | 04.04.2001 | ||
CH | 04.04.2001 | ||
LI | 04.04.2001 | ||
PT | 04.07.2001 | ||
GR | 06.07.2001 | ||
FR | 31.08.2001 | ||
ES | 30.10.2001 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 04.04.2001 | |
BE | 04.04.2001 | ||
CH | 04.04.2001 | ||
LI | 04.04.2001 | ||
PT | 04.07.2001 | ||
FR | 31.08.2001 | ||
ES | 30.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 04.04.2001 | |
BE | 04.04.2001 | ||
CH | 04.04.2001 | ||
LI | 04.04.2001 | ||
PT | 04.07.2001 | ||
FR | 31.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/17] | AT | 04.04.2001 | |
BE | 04.04.2001 | ||
CH | 04.04.2001 | ||
LI | 04.04.2001 | ||
FR | 31.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 04.04.2001 | |
BE | 04.04.2001 | ||
CH | 04.04.2001 | ||
LI | 04.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 04.04.2001 | |
BE | 04.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | BE | 04.04.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2026364 (SALZGITTER MASCHINEN AG) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US3703212 (ABRAHAMS JOSEPH L) [A] 1* column 2, line 43 - line 66 *; | [A]US4102409 (LAGERSTEDT JOHN ARNE) [A] 1 * column 2, line 12 - line 52 *; | [A]US4148367 (REICH WENDELL L) [A] 1 * column 3, line 21 - line 31 * | other | - Leaflet of the firm CASAGRANDE SPA dated 2 Januar 1994 relating to machine HT55 | - Leaflet of the firm CASAGRANDE SPA Describing the technical features of the HT55 machine | - "Foundation Engineering Equipment", CONASTRUCTION EUROPE, (199404), pages 49 - 53 |