EP0726253 - Process for the preparation of N-(ortho-alkyl-phenyl)-imides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.1998 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.12.1998 [1998/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1996/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Groth, Torsten, Dr. Gerstenkamp 21 D-51061 Köln / DE | 02 /
König, Bernd-Michael, Dr. Reuterstr. 203 D-51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 03 /
Käsbauer, Josef, Dr. Gartenfeld 37 D-42929 Wermelskirchen / DE | 04 /
Schwamborn, Michael, Dr. Prämontstratenserstr. 76 D-51069 Köln / DE | [1996/33] | Application number, filing date | 96101301.8 | 31.01.1996 | [1996/33] | Priority number, date | DE1995104626 | 13.02.1995 Original published format: DE 19504626 | [1996/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0726253 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/452, C07D207/40 | [1996/33] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von N-(ortho-Alkylphenyl)-imiden | [1996/33] | English: | Process for the preparation of N-(ortho-alkyl-phenyl)-imides | [1996/33] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de N-(ortho-alkylphényl)-imides | [1996/33] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/12] | 09.10.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0551362 ; | [A]GB1041027 (ICI LTD) [A] * the whole document *; | [AD]DE2100800 (SUMITOMO) [AD] 1-11* the whole document *; | [AD]US3890270 (MINIERI PASQUALE P) [AD] 1-11 * example 1 *; | [DA]EP0165574 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [DA] 1-11 * page 1 - page 4, line 3 * * table 1 *; | [AD]EP0177031 (NITTO CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [AD] * example 1 *; | [A]US4904803 (FUJITA TAKEYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0461096 (UCB SA [BE]) [AD] 1-11 * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 46 * * example 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930708), vol. 17, no. 361, Database accession no. (C - 1080), & JP05051362 A 19930302 (HITACHI) [X] 1-11 * abstract * |