EP0726053 - Method and device for preparing a beverage such as espresso coffee [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. LOUGH LIMITED 4, Lower Hatch Street Dublin 2 / IE | [1996/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmed, Arthur-Joachim Langrütistrasse 87 CH-8635 Oberdürnten / CH | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96101522.9 | 02.02.1996 | [1996/33] | Priority number, date | CH19950000354 | 08.02.1995 Original published format: CH 35495 | [1996/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0726053 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0726053 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/40, A47J31/06 | [1996/33] | CPC: |
A47J31/0605 (EP,US);
A47J31/0663 (EP,US);
A47J31/0668 (EP,US);
A47J31/4496 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, PT [1996/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bereiten eines Getränkes sowie Espresso Kaffee | [1996/33] | English: | Method and device for preparing a beverage such as espresso coffee | [1996/33] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour préparer une boisson comme du café espresso | [1996/33] | Examination procedure | 22.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 27.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2601067 (SPENCER PERCY L); | [A]US3288049 (HEINRICH SCHMID, et al) [A] 1,3,4,6-8 * column 1, line 49 - column 3, line 9; figure - *; | [A]FR2231341 (DONOT GUY [FR], et al) [A] 1,6 * page 1, line 23 - page 2, line 13; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3035157 (HANS WIRTZ PLASTIKVERARBEITUNG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * page 6, paragraph 1 - page 8, paragraph 1; figure 3 *; | [A]US4633771 (ANDERL SIEGFRIED [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,6-8 * column 2, line 10 - column 7, line 31; figure - *; | [A]DE3909738 (PATZNER GMBH) [A] 1,3,4,7,8 * column 2, line 53 - column 6, line 4; figure - *; | [A]US5134925 (BUNN ARTHUR H [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4,6-8 * column 3, line 57 - column 10, line 33; figure - *; | [YA]EP0555775 (DOMEL SA AG [CH]) [Y] 6 * column 1, line 35 - line 41 * * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 6; figures 3,4,6 * [A] 1; | [YA]EP0622039 (ESSEGIELLE SRL [IT]) [Y] 6 * column 1, line 55 - column 3, line 26; figures 1,2 * [A] 7,9 |