EP0734914 - Profile containing an airbag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAW aluminium AG Georg-von-Boeselager-Strasse 25 53117 Bonn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | For all designated states VAW Aluminium AG Georg-von-Boeselager-Strasse 25 D-53117 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dede, Carsten, Dipl.-Ing. Brunnenallee 23 D-53332 Roisdorf / DE | 02 /
Branski, Thomas B. 4701 West Avenida Del Rey Glendale, AZ 85310 / US | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Müller-Wolff, Thomas, et al HARWARDT NEUMANN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte BrandTstrasse 10 53721 Siegburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Müller-Wolff, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing., et al HARWARDT NEUMANN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Brandstrasse 10 53721 Siegburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96101802.5 | 08.02.1996 | [1996/40] | Priority number, date | DE1995112378 | 01.04.1995 Original published format: DE 19512378 | [1996/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0734914 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0734914 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20, F16F7/12 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
B60R21/2171 (EP,US);
B60R21/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/40] | Title | German: | Airbagaufnahmeprofil | [1996/40] | English: | Profile containing an airbag | [1996/40] | French: | Profilé contenant un coussin de sécurité gonflable | [1996/40] | Examination procedure | 24.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 11.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.05.1998 | FR | 13.05.1998 | GB | 13.05.1998 | IT | 13.05.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 13.05.1998 | |
GB | 13.05.1998 | ||
IT | 13.05.1998 | ||
FR | 09.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 13.05.1998 | |
IT | 13.05.1998 | ||
FR | 09.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/25] | GB | 13.05.1998 | |
FR | 09.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | FR | 09.10.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4016681 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 8; figures 2,4 *; | [A]WO9114110 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2265337 (TAKATA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,5,7 * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph L; figures 1,4 *; | [DX]US5342082 (KRISKA THOMAS M [US], et al) [DX] 1,3,4 * column 1, line 24 - line 55 * * column 1, line 63 - line 66 * * column 2, line 53 - line 54 *; | [PX]US5482313 (IKEYA AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [PX] 1-5,7 * column 6, line 33 - line 49 * * column 7, line 62 - line 67 ** column 8, line 42 - line 51 *; | [A] - HÜTTE GESELLSCHAFT FÜR TECHNISCHE INFORMATIONEN MBH, BERLIN, Hütte des Ingenieurs Taschenbuch, Physikhütte, Band 1, BERLIN, VERLAG VON WILHEM ERNST & SOHN, (1971), XP002008824 [A] 1-7 * page 136 - page 138 * | [A] - DR.-ING. J. RUGE, Handbuch der Schweisstechnik, Band 1: Werkstoffe, BERLIN, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1980), XP002008825 [A] 1,6 * page 36 * |