EP0728648 - Articulated train [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JENBACHER ENERGIESYSTEME AG Achenseestrasse 1-3 A-6200 Jenbach / AT | [1996/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sommerer, Rudolf, Dr. Rossschwemme 3a A-6200 Jenbach / AT | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul, et al Patentanwälte Torggler und Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 Postfach 556 6021 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Torggler, Paul, Dr., et al Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 96102028.6 | 13.02.1996 | [1996/35] | Priority number, date | AT19950000349 | 27.02.1995 Original published format: AT 34995 | [1996/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0728648 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0728648 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B61D3/10 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
B61D3/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1996/35] | Title | German: | Gliederzug | [1996/35] | English: | Articulated train | [1996/35] | French: | Train articulé | [1996/35] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 13.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 26.10.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 12.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 10.09.1997 | BE | 28.02.1998 | [2003/09] |
Former [1999/27] | BE | 28.02.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE490825 (CARL BUDERUS) [A] 1* page 2, line 40 - page 3, line 28; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2462666 (GOICOECHEA OMAR ALEJANDRO) [A] 1 * column 3, line 12 - column 5, line 37; figures 1-6 *; | [XA]DE9404993U (JENBACHER TRANSPORTSYSTEME [AT]) [X] 1 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 2; figures 1,3,4 * [A] 4,8,9,12 |