EP0790334 - Easily dyeable meta-linkage-containing aromatic polyamide fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2001 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7 Minamihommachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8587 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7 Minamihommachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8587 / JP | ||
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7 Minamihommachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohba, Akihiro Teijin Ltd., Matsuyama Fact.,77, Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime / JP | 02 /
Sasaki, Koki Teijin Ltd., Iwakuni Factory, 2-1, Hinode-cho Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96102132.6 | 14.02.1996 | [1997/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0790334 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0790334 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/60, D01F1/10, D01F1/07 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
D01F1/07 (EP);
D01F1/10 (EP);
D01F6/605 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/34] | Title | German: | Leicht färbbare Metabindungen enthaltende aromatische Polyamidfasern | [1997/34] | English: | Easily dyeable meta-linkage-containing aromatic polyamide fibres | [1997/34] | French: | Fibres de polyamides aromatiques avec liaisons en position méta, pouvant être aisément teintes | [1997/34] | Examination procedure | 03.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 25.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]JPH0881827 ; | [A]EP0228224 (E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY); | [A]EP0212948 (E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY); | [A]US3779705 (YAMADA S ET AL); | [A]US4196118 (FUJIE HIROSHI ET AL); | [A]EP0330163 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]EP0006564 (CIBA GEIGY AG) | [E] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 22, Database accession no. 96-217525, XP002009112 & JPH0881827 A 19960326 (TEIJIN LTD) [E] 1-17 * abstract * |