EP0728490 - Blood treatment device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Müller, Hans Reichenhaller Strasse 49 81547 München / DE | [1996/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96102297.7 | 15.02.1996 | [1996/35] | Priority number, date | DE1995106163 | 22.02.1995 Original published format: DE 19506163 | [1996/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0728490 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0728490 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/32, A61M1/36 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
A61M1/3681 (EP,US);
A61M1/304 (EP,US);
A61M1/32 (EP,US);
A61M1/3683 (EP,US);
A61M1/66 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0216 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT [1996/35] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von Blut | [1996/35] | English: | Blood treatment device | [1996/35] | French: | Dispositif de traitement du sang | [1996/35] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/22: Teilanmeldung 97103776.7 eingereicht am 06/03/97 | EPB 1997/22: Divisional application 97103776.7 filed on 06/03/97 | EPB 1997/22: Demande divisionnaire 97103776.7 déposée le 06/03/97 | Examination procedure | 22.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/26] | 04.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/15] | 26.11.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/15] | Divisional application(s) | EP97103776.7 / EP0786262 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SE8504062 ; | [A]US2887107 (FEDERICO WEHRLI); | [A]US3325641 (JONES GEORGE W) [A] 1 * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 21; figure - *; | [A]DE8901513U (HÜBNER, KARL-ALEXANDER) [A] 1 * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 2; figures 1-3 * * page 10, line 1 - page 12, line 26 *; | [ADP]DE4410411 (MUELLER HANS [DE]) [ADP] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - line 67 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 16, Database accession no. 87-114052, XP002017588 & SE8504062 A 19870303 (GAMBRO CARDIO AB) [A] * abstract * |