EP0736919 - Alkaline metal oxide, metal hydride battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VARTA Batterie Aktiengesellschaft Am Leineufer 51 30419 Hannover / DE | For all designated states TREIBACHER AUERMET Produktionsges. m.b.H. 9330 Treibach-Althofen / AT | [1996/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lichtenberg, Frank, Dr. Hauptstrasse 74 67378 Zeiskam / DE | 02 /
Köhler, Uwe, Dr. In den Padenwiesen 23 65779 Kelkheim / DE | 03 /
Kleinsorgen, Klaus Ruppertshainer Strasse 21 65779 Kelkheim / DE | 04 /
Fölzer, Andreas Bunsenweg 17 9330 Treibach-Althofen / AT | 05 /
Bouvier, Alexander, Dr. Jerolitschstrasse 19 9021 Krumpendorf / AT | [1996/41] | Representative(s) | Kaiser, Dieter Ralf Patentassessor, Carl-Orff-Weg 20 65812 Bad Soden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | Kaiser, Dieter Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. Gundelhardtstrasse 72 65779 Kelkheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 96102419.7 | 17.02.1996 | [1996/41] | Priority number, date | DE1995112841 | 06.04.1995 Original published format: DE 19512841 | [1996/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0736919 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0736919 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/27] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0736919 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | [1998/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/38 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
H01M4/383 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/0419 (KR);
H01M4/0471 (KR);
H01M4/26 (KR);
H01M10/345 (KR);
H01M4/242 (KR);
H01M4/32 (KR);
H01M4/808 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y10S420/90 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/41] | Title | German: | Alkalische Metalloxid-Metallhydrid-Batterie | [1996/41] | English: | Alkaline metal oxide, metal hydride battery | [1996/41] | French: | Batterie alcaline du type oxyde métallique, hydrure métallique | [1996/41] | Examination procedure | 14.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 26.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06256873 ; | [A]JPH06145850 ; | [A]JPH05331506 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941214), vol. 018, no. 662, Database accession no. (C - 1287), & JP06256873 A 19940913 (SHIN ETSU CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940831), vol. 018, no. 468, Database accession no. (C - 1244), & JP06145850 A 19940527 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACH CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940317), vol. 018, no. 160, Database accession no. (M - 1578), & JP05331506 A 19931214 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [A] 5 * abstract * |