EP0728828 - Organic electroluminescent device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2001 [2001/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | ||
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sano, Takeshi 17-27, Asahigaoka-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Fujii, Takanori 325-C-101, Kamimonobe Sumoto-shi, Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Kuroki, Kazuhiko 2-1-163, Hatoyama Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | 04 /
Hamada, Yuji 5-20-207, Tokiwa-cho Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Shibata, Kenichi 2-1-21, Kouyoudai Hashimoto-Shi, Wakayama / JP | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96102697.8 | 22.02.1996 | [1996/35] | Priority number, date | JP19950062138 | 24.02.1995 Original published format: JP 6213895 | [1996/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0728828 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0728828 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | [1997/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0728828 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/06, H05B33/14 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
C09B11/24 (EP,US);
C09B23/145 (EP,US);
C09B3/78 (EP,US);
C09B57/00 (EP,US);
C09B57/008 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/35] | Title | German: | Organische elektrolumineszente Vorrichtung | [1996/35] | English: | Organic electroluminescent device | [1996/35] | French: | Dispositif organique électroluminescent | [1996/35] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/26] | 14.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0532966 ; | [A]JPH06136359 ; | US5449564 [ ] (NISHIO YOSHITAKA [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930622), vol. 017, no. 327, Database accession no. (C - 1073), & JP05032966 A 19930209 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940818), vol. 018, no. 443, Database accession no. (C - 1239), & JP06136359 A 19940517 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,5-7,11,12 * abstract * |