EP0724082 - Rodless cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMC Kabushiki Kaisha 16-4, Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8659 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states SMC Kabushiki Kaisha 16-4, Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8659 / JP | ||
Former [1996/31] | For all designated states SMC KABUSHIKI KAISHA 16-4, Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takada, Yoshiyuki, c/o SMC K.K. 16-4, Shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Miyamoto, Michikazu, c/o SMC K.K. 2-2, Kinunodai 4-chome Yawara-mura, Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1996/31] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Eysseneckstrasse 31 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 96103507.8 | 10.10.1992 | [1996/31] | Priority number, date | JP19910264166 | 11.10.1991 Original published format: JP 26416691 | JP19910265091 | 14.10.1991 Original published format: JP 26509191 | JP19910288120 | 01.11.1991 Original published format: JP 28812091 | JP19920202765 | 29.07.1992 Original published format: JP 20276592 | [1996/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0724082 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0724082 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | [1998/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0724082 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/08 | [1996/31] | CPC: |
F15B15/082 (EP,US);
F16C29/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/31] | Title | German: | Kolbenstangenloser Arbeitszylinder | [1996/31] | English: | Rodless cylinder | [1996/31] | French: | Vérin sans tige | [1996/31] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 26.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92117353.0 / EP0536799 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.10.1998 | M01   Fee paid on   12.11.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2367156 (THOMPSON LOREN E) [X] 1,3-5 * page 1, column R, line 18 - line 23; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]DE2908605 (MUELLER GEB KOTZ ROSA) [Y] 2,7,8 * page 2, paragraph 1; figure . *; | [DA]DE3124915 (KAISER SIEGMUND H ING GRAD [DE]); | [DA]US4373427 (GARLAPATY VENKAT R, et al) [DA] 1 * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 6; figure 4 *; | [XY]DE3403830 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-6 * page 9, line 1 - line 4 * * page 13, line 23 - line 29; figures 2,7 * [Y] 2,7,8; | [A]GB2164709 (TERAMACHI HIROSHI) [A] 2,7,8 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0327705 (NEFF GEWINDESPINDELN) [A] 2,7,8 * figure 3 *; | [DPX]EP0476265 (KNORR BREMSE AG [DE]) [DPX] 1,3-5 * abstract *; | [PX]EP0502810 (ASCOLECTRIC LTD [CA]) [PX] 1,3-6 * abstract * |