EP0731188 - Apparatus and method for depositing films on substrate via off-axis laser ablation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itozaki, Hideo c/o Sumitomo El. Ind., Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664 / JP | 02 /
Nagaishi, Tatsuoki c/o Sumitomo El. Ind., Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664 / JP | [1996/37] | Representative(s) | von Fischern, Bernhard, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | Ritter und Edler von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96103558.1 | 07.03.1996 | [1996/37] | Priority number, date | JP19950074422 | 07.03.1995 Original published format: JP 7442295 | [1996/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0731188 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0731188 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0731188 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/28, C23C14/24 | [1996/37] | CPC: |
C23C14/28 (EP,US);
H10N60/0521 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/37] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Ablagerung von Filmen auf ein Substrat durch ausserachsiale Laserablation | [1996/37] | English: | Apparatus and method for depositing films on substrate via off-axis laser ablation | [1996/37] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour le dépôt de films sur un substrat par ablation au laser hors d'axe | [1996/37] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/26] | 02.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2231587 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]WO9213113 (EUROP COMMUNITIES [LU]); | [A]WO9401595 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) |