EP0730963 - Image recording method and apparatus using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.1999 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.1999 [1999/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Higuchi, Kaoru 762-7 Isonokami-cho Tenri-shi, Nara / JP | 02 /
Ishii, Hiroshi 5-2-3-204 Shirakashi-cho Kashihara-shi, Nara / JP | 03 /
Tsunezawa, Masayoshi 1-1-703 Nakatsuji-cho Nara-shi, Nara / JP | 04 /
Ozaki, Masaaki 1-15-16-101 Rokujo Nara-shi, Nara / JP | 05 /
Nagata, Masaya 1-9-3-111 Hourai Nara-shi, Nara / JP | [1996/44] |
Former [1996/37] | 01 /
Higuchi, Kaoru 762-7 Isonokami-cho Tenri-shi, Nara / JP | ||
02 /
Ishii, Hiroshi 5-2-4-204 Shirakashi-cho Kashikhara-shi, Nara / JP | |||
03 /
Tsunezawa, Masayoshi 1-1-703 Nakatsuji-cho Nara-shi, Nara / JP | |||
04 /
Ozaki, Masaaki 1-15-16-101 Rokujo Nara-shi, Nara / JP | |||
05 /
Nagata, Masaya 1-9-3-111 Hourai Nara-shi, Nara / JP | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E., et al Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/37] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96103588.8 | 07.03.1996 | [1996/37] | Priority number, date | JP19950049778 | 09.03.1995 Original published format: JP 4977895 | JP19950232484 | 11.09.1995 Original published format: JP 23248495 | [1996/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0730963 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0730963 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/06 | [1996/37] | CPC: |
B41J2/06 (EP);
B41J2002/061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/37] | Title | German: | Bildaufzeichnungsverfahren und Vorrichtung zu dessen Verwendung | [1996/37] | English: | Image recording method and apparatus using the same | [1996/37] | French: | Procédé d'enregistrement d'image et appareil utilisant ce procédé | [1996/37] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/07] | 15.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/45] | 16.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH05124222 ; | [Y]JPS61106261 ; | [Y]JPH04307253 ; | [A]JPH05104724 ; | [A]EP0284282 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4333086 (EBI) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5144340 (HOTOMI ET AL.) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930907), vol. 017, no. 493, Database accession no. (M - 1475), & JP05124222 A 19930521 (MINOLTA CAMERA CO LTD) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861003), vol. 010, no. 291, Database accession no. (M - 522), & JP61106261 A 19860524 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930317), vol. 017, no. 126, Database accession no. (M - 1381), & JP04307253 A 19921029 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930820), vol. 017, no. 455, Database accession no. (M - 1466), & JP05104724 A 19930427 (MINOLTA CAMERA CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |