EP0732049 - Covering material for plant growth control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.1999 [1999/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, INCORPORATED 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aiga, Ichiro 2-26-5, Minamimaruhoen Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Murakami, Katsusuke 1-27-5-306, Tsukaguchicho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Ikado, Shuhei 2-14-24, Daido, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Nakamura, Ryu 5-1-7-304, Isogo, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Oi, Ryu 3-33-6, Hongodai, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 06 /
Seino, Kazuhiro 3-42-7-227, Hirado, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 07 /
Takuma, Keisuke 1172-3-402, Kamikuratamachi, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1996/38] | Representative(s) | Schüler, Horst Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner, Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Schüler, Horst Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner, Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1996/38] | Schüler, Horst, Dr. Patentanwalt, Kaiserstrasse 69 60329 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 96103632.4 | 08.03.1996 | [1996/38] | Priority number, date | JP19950058436 | 17.03.1995 Original published format: JP 5843695 | JP19950058437 | 17.03.1995 Original published format: JP 5843795 | JP19950058439 | 17.03.1995 Original published format: JP 5843995 | [1996/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0732049 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0732049 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/14 | [1996/38] | CPC: |
A01G9/1438 (EP,US);
A01G13/00 (KR);
Y02A40/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL [1996/38] | Title | German: | Bedeckungsmaterial zum Kontrollieren des Pflanzenwachstums | [1996/38] | English: | Covering material for plant growth control | [1996/38] | French: | Matière de recouvrement pour le contrôle de la croissance de plantes | [1996/38] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/38] | 13.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05217556 ; | [A]JPH04207127 ; | [A]US3911620 (GLATTI FLAVIANO) [A] 1,3 * column 12, line 56 - column 14, line 2 *; | [A]US4791023 (SUZUKI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 40 * * column 4, line 48 - line 50 * * column 4, line 64 - line 67 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931203), vol. 017, no. 653, Database accession no. (E - 1469), & JP05217556 A 19930827 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921113), vol. 016, no. 544, Database accession no. (C - 1004), & JP04207127 A 19920729 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |