EP0738626 - Device for variable partitioning of a luggage compartment of a motor vehicle and for retaining freight [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18 72178 Waldachtal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/43] | For all designated states fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18 D-72178 Waldachtal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ackeret, Peter Allmendstrasse 18 8700 Küsnacht / CH | [1996/43] | Application number, filing date | 96103658.9 | 09.03.1996 | [1996/43] | Priority number, date | DE1995114605 | 20.04.1995 Original published format: DE 19514605 | [1996/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0738626 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0738626 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60P7/08, B60P7/14 | [1998/38] | CPC: |
B60R7/02 (EP,US);
B60P7/00 (KR);
B60P7/0815 (EP,US);
B60P7/14 (EP,US);
Y10S224/925 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/43] | B60P7/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/43] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum variablen Unterteilen eines Kraftfahrzeug-Kofferraums und Festhalten des Ladegutes | [1996/43] | English: | Device for variable partitioning of a luggage compartment of a motor vehicle and for retaining freight | [1996/43] | French: | Dispositif de compartimentage variable d'un compartiment à bagage d'un véhicule à moteur et de fixation de la charge | [1996/43] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/17] | 27.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2701786 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]DE7828641U (KRATZMEIER); | [X]DE7819957U (HEIDECKER) [X] 2 * figures 1,5 *; | [X]DE3048826 (KRAUSS WOLFGANG) [X] 1,9 * figures 1,5,6; claim 1 * |