EP0736683 - Device for connecting an exhaust gas recirculation system with an intake system of a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1996/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hezel, Bruno Am Wildwechsel 2 D- 70565 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Rosenbusch, Andreas-Bernd Lange Str. 56 D-71404 Korb / DE | [1996/41] | Application number, filing date | 96103707.4 | 09.03.1996 | [1996/41] | Priority number, date | DE1995112941 | 06.04.1995 Original published format: DE 19512941 | [1996/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0736683 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0736683 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F02M35/10, F02M25/07 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
F02M35/10144 (EP);
F02M26/12 (EP);
F02M26/21 (EP);
F02M35/10222 (EP);
F02M26/70 (EP);
F05C2225/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verbinden eines Abgasrückführsystems mit einer Sauganlage eines Verbrennungsmotors | [1996/41] | English: | Device for connecting an exhaust gas recirculation system with an intake system of a combustion engine | [1996/41] | French: | Dispositif pour relier un système de recirculation de gaz d'échappement à un système d'admission d'un moteur à combustion | [1996/41] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 21.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 17.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2000/14] | 27.11.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5201549 (DAVEY) [X] 1-3 * column 7, line 22 - column 8, line 23; figures 5-9 * [Y] 4-6; | [Y]DE3509774 (WITZENMANN) [Y] 4-6 * page 15, paragraph 4 - page 16, paragraph 3; figure 7 *; | [A]FR2706976 (SOLVAY) [A] 1,2,5,6 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 1, line 14 - line 25 * * page 4, line 24 - line 29 * * page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 2 * * page 9, line 5 - line 8 * * page 11, line 30 - page 12, line 1; figures 1A,1B *; | [X]US5425347 (ZINKE) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 6 - line 8 * * column 2, line 40 - line 55 * * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 15 * * column 4, line 28 - line 31 * * column 4, line 41 - line 45; figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE4310510 (CARL FREUDENBERG) |