EP0730351 - Full flash analog-to-digital converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komatsu, Yoshihiro c/o Sony Corp., 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Gendai, Yuji c/o Sony Corp., 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96103760.3 | 26.02.1991 | [1996/36] | Priority number, date | JP19900047431 | 28.02.1990 Original published format: JP 4743190 | JP19900071556 | 20.03.1990 Original published format: JP 7155690 | JP19900091427 | 06.04.1990 Original published format: JP 9142790 | JP19900071555 | 20.03.1990 Original published format: JP 7155590 | JP19900084320 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: JP 8432090 | JP19900104475 | 20.04.1990 Original published format: JP 10447590 | [1996/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0730351 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0730351 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | [1997/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0730351 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/36 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
H03M1/0687 (EP);
H03M1/0809 (EP);
H03M1/365 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/36] | Title | German: | Vollflash-Analog-Digitalwandler | [1996/36] | English: | Full flash analog-to-digital converter | [1996/36] | French: | Convertisseur analogique-numérique intrégralement parallèle | [1996/36] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/36] | 26.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91301558.2 / EP0444890 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2002/18] | FR | 21.12.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4866444 (NEJIME YOSHITO ET AL) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 15 - line 19 * * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 50; figures 2,3 *; | [A]GB2082410 (PLESSEY CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A] - INOUE M ET AL, "A monolithic 8-bit A/D converter with 120 MHz conversion rate", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, DEC. 1984, USA, ISSN 0018-9200, vol. SC-19, no. 6, pages 837 - 841, XP000615135 [A] 1,2 * page 837, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 838, column 1, line 7; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.1984.1052234 |